Reports for SIP Switzerland AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SIP Switzerland AG
- SIP Switzerland AG with its legal headquarters in Dübendorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Services for insurance and pensions». SIP Switzerland AG is active.
- The management of the company SIP Switzerland AG, which was founded on the 05.04.2006, consists of 4 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 02.07.2024.
- In the commercial register the company SIP Switzerland AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.867.549.
- Bluespace Ventures AG, Cyberfy Consulting AG, FICHTNER MANAGEMENT CONSULTING AG SCHWEIZ are registered at the same address.
Management (4)
newest board members
Kevin Bürchler,
Joachim Gregor Wegmann,
Maehala Kälin,
André F. Herrmann
newest authorized signatories
Kevin Bürchler,
Joachim Gregor Wegmann,
Maehala Kälin,
André F. Herrmann
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.04.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dübendorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.029.758-8
UID/VAT
CHE-112.867.549
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung, Vermittlung und Abwicklung betreffend Versicherungen. Die Gesellschaft kann im übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Entwicklung der Unternehmung und die Erreichung des Geschäftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern und kann Grundbesitz erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audvisa Revisions AG | Risch | 10.10.2013 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TBO Revisions AG | Zürich | 25.09.2007 | 09.10.2013 | |
Auditor Revisions AG | Risch | 11.04.2006 | 24.09.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Swiss Insurance Partners AG
- SIP Swiss Insurance Partners AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SIP Switzerland AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006072497, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SIP Switzerland AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-112.867.549, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 12.06.2024, Publ. 1006054358).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Maciejewski, Robert Konrad, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Appenzell, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006054358, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SIP Switzerland AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-112.867.549, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 110 vom 10.06.2024, Publ. 1006051890).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kälin-Wiederkehr, Margot Josefine, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006051890, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 104 vom 31.05.2024 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 22'533 vom 28.05.2024 SIP Switzerland AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-112.867.549, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 31.05.2024, Publ. 1006044630). Im SHAB Nr. 104 vom 31.05.2024 publizierte TR-Eintrag 22533 vom 28.05.2024 wurde Kälin, Maehala, von Zürich, in Meilen als Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien irrtümlich gelöscht. Diese Person wird wieder als Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien eingetragen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kälin, Maehala, von Zürich, in Meilen, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.