Reports for SINVEST Beteiligungs AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SINVEST Beteiligungs AG
- SINVEST Beteiligungs AG from Wohlen AG operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions» and is active.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 29.11.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company SINVEST Beteiligungs AG is registered under the UID CHE-182.366.821.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Sinvest Finanz AG, Sommerhalder und Furrer Stiftung.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Bucheli,
Urs Lüscher,
Patrick Kurt Burger,
Sandra Melliger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.02.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Villmergen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.073.330-8
UID/VAT
CHE-182.366.821
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf und Verkauf sowie das Führen, Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen, das Erbringen von damit zusammenhängenden oder ähnlichen Dienstleistungen, das Ausführen von Managementaufgaben sowie den Erwerb, die Bewirtschaftung, die Verwaltung, die Überbauung, das Halten und die Veräusserung von Immobilien sowie Projektentwicklungen im Immobilienbereich. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte tätigen und Verträge schliessen, die geeignet sind, den Geschäftszweck zu fördern oder direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmen, welche gleiche oder ähnliche Zwecke verfolgen, beteiligen oder solche Unternehmen erwerben. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Z26 Beteiligungen AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SINVEST Beteiligungs AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005344676, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SINVEST Beteiligungs AG, in Villmergen, CHE-182.366.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 06.04.2021, Publ. 1005141185).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bucheli, Thomas, von Schwarzenberg, in Auenstein, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005141185, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SINVEST Beteiligungs AG, in Villmergen, CHE-182.366.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 25 vom 06.02.2019, Publ. 1004560097).
Domizil neu:
Villmergerstrasse 38, 5610 Wohlen AG.
Publication number: HR02-1004560097, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Z26 Beteiligungen AG, bisher in Burgdorf, CHE-182.366.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 05.03.2018, Publ. 4090699).
Statutenänderung:
17.01.2019.
Firma neu:
SINVEST Beteiligungs AG.
Sitz neu:
Villmergen.
Domizil neu:
c/o Sinvest Finanz AG, Ringstrasse 28, 5610 Wohlen AG.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fischer, Urs, von Meisterschwanden und Aarau, in Matten bei Interlaken, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Keiser, Silvia, von Reitnau und Zürich, in Herzogenbuchsee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüscher, Urs, von Muhen, in Meisterschwanden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bucheli, Thomas, von Schwarzenberg, in Auenstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Burger, Patrick, von Fahrwangen, in Meisterschwanden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Melliger, Sandra, von Buttwil, in Widen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.