Address
c/o Fiduconsult Neuchâtel SA
Rue du Temple-Neuf 4
2000 Neuchâtel
Reports for Sinpa Holding S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sinpa Holding S.A.
- Sinpa Holding S.A. is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Neuchâtel.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 13.01.1988.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 30.08.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of NE is CHE-106.239.557.
- On the same address as Sinpa Holding S.A. there are 13 other active companies registered. These include: AJ La Casa Sàrl, Boss et Partenaires SA, BT - Schurch & Cie SNC.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.01.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Neuchâtel
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.0.401.064-1
UID/VAT
CHE-106.239.557
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Création de sociétés, financement ainsi que prise et détention de participations au capital social d'autres sociétés et l'exercice de direction de sociétés et ce dans le sens d'une société holding.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidexaudit révision SA | Lausanne | 27.05.2008 | 14.05.2015 | |
Deloitte SA | Genève | <2004 | 26.05.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sinpa Holding S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005280415, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Sinpa Holding S.A., à Neuchâtel, CHE-106.239.557 (FOSC du 27.12.2018, p. 0/1004531547). Favalli Denis-Louis n'est plus membre du conseil d'administration;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Klein Daniel, jusqu'ici président, désormais administrateur unique, continue de signer individuellement.
Adresse:
rue du Temple-Neuf 4, c/o Fiduconsult Neuchâtel SA, 2000 Neuchâtel.
Publication number: HR02-1004531547, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Sinpa Holding S.A., à Neuchâtel, CHE-106.239.557 (FOSC du 15.05.2015, p. 0/2154235).
Nouvelle adresse:
rue du Temple-Neuf 4, c/o Fiduconsult Exafid SA, 2001 Neuchâtel 1.
Publication number: 2154235, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Sinpa Holding S.A., à Neuchâtel, CHE-106.239.557 (FOSC du 25.04.2014, p. 0/1470257).
Communications aux actionnaires:
par lettres personnelles recommandées s'ils sont connus, ou par une seule insertion dans la Feuille officielle suisse du Commerce. Statuts modifiés le 06.05.2015. La mention relative à l'organisation de la société est radiée, celle-ci n'étant plus obligatoire. Favalli Denis-Louis est maintenant originaire de Val-de-Ruz et domicilié à Val-de-Ruz. 'Fidexaudit révision SA' (CHE-102.868.553) n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 06.05.2015, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et a renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.