Reports for Simo Sante AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Simo Sante AG
- Simo Sante AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of general healthcare facilities». The legal headquarters are in Bern.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 15.02.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-185.161.385.
- On the same address as Simo Sante AG there are 13 other active companies registered. These include: Aerzte-Gesundheitshaus Bern AG, Andrei Oros, Anice Grossenbacher.
Management (3)
newest board members
Lorenz Sebastian Müller,
Corinne Künzi,
Moritz Stefan Müller
newest authorized signatories
Lorenz Sebastian Müller,
Corinne Künzi,
Moritz Stefan Müller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.06.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.054.282-2
UID/VAT
CHE-185.161.385
Sector
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen aller Art im Bereich Gesundheitswesen, Wellness, und Liegenschaftsverwaltung. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften und Beteiligungen aller Art halten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Kerényi Balzli Treuhand AG | Köniz | 10.01.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Grossglauser Treuhand AG | Worb | 04.07.2012 | 09.01.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Simo Sante AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005961883, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Simo Sante AG, in Bern, CHE-185.161.385, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2018, Publ. 3978931).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Lorenz Sebastian, von Safenwil, in Konolfingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Künzi, Corinne, von Safenwil, in Konolfingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Wenger-Müller, Corinne Elisabeth, von Safenwil und Thierachern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Müller, Moritz Stefan, von Safenwil, in Konolfingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3978931, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Simo Sante AG, in Bern, CHE-185.161.385, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 04.07.2012, Publ. 6752002).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grossglauser + Kerényi Treuhand AG (CH-035.3.001.496-6), in Melchenbühl (Muri bei Bern), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kerényi Balzli Treuhand AG (CHE-214.294.151), in Liebefeld (Köniz), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6752002, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Simo Sante AG, in Bern, CH-036.3.054.282-2, Randweg 9, 3013 Bern, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
20.06.2012.
Zweck:
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen aller Art im Bereich Gesundheitswesen, Wellness, und Liegenschaftsverwaltung. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften und Beteiligungen aller Art halten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 1'000'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 1'000'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung gemäss Vermögensübertragungsvertrag vom 20.06.2012 und Inventar per 31.12.2011 Aktiven von CHF 8'545'856.57 und Fremdkapital von CHF 687'295.61 der Simo-Sante Müller & Co. Immobilien und Dienstleistungen, in Bern (CH-036.2.049.117-3), wofür 1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben und CHF 6'858'560.96 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Sachübernahme:
Die Gesellschaft übernimmt gemäss Vertrag vom 20.06.2012 die Grundstücke Bern 5-Gbbl. Nrn. 1349, 1351, 2722, 1352, 948 und 2856 zum Preis von CHF 377'000.00.
Beabsichtigte Sachübernahme:
Die Gesellschaft beabsichtigt, nach der Gründung die Grundstücke Oftringen-Gbbl. Nrn. 1737, 3336, 3342 und 3985 zum Preis von höchstens CHF 2'275'000.00 zu übernehmen.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre:
schriftlich, mit Telefax oder mit elektronischer Post.
Eingetragene Personen:
Müller, Lorenz Sebastian, von Safenwil, in Konolfingen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Müller, Moritz Stefan, von Safenwil, in Konolfingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wenger-Müller, Corinne Elisabeth, von Safenwil und Thierachern, in Konolfingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Grossglauser + Kerényi Treuhand AG (CH-035.3.001.496-6), in Muri bei Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.