Address
c/o Georg Flury
Zum Chäscher 2
7278 Davos Monstein
Reports for Silberberg Monstein AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Silberberg Monstein AG
- Silberberg Monstein AG with its legal headquarters in Davos Monstein is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Silberberg Monstein AG is active.
- Silberberg Monstein AG was founded on 25.09.2017.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 29.06.2020. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Silberberg Monstein AG is registered in the Canton of GR under the UID CHE-203.840.500.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.09.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Davos
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.012.774-0
UID/VAT
CHE-203.840.500
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Veräusserung, Verwaltung und Vermietung von Immobilien sowie deren Überbauung und Vermittlung; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Silberberg Monstein AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004923033, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Silberberg Monstein AG, in Davos, CHE-203.840.500, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2017, Publ. 3777989).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Keller, Reto, von Konolfingen, in Davos, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ris, Sabrina, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Flury, Georg, von Klosters-Serneus, in Davos, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Flury, Corinna Maria, von Davos, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3777989, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Silberberg Monstein AG, in Davos, CHE-203.840.500, c/o Georg Flury, zum Chäscher 2, 7278 Davos Monstein, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
21.09.2017.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Veräusserung, Verwaltung und Vermietung von Immobilien sowie deren Überbauung und Vermittlung;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Beabsichtigte Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft beabsichtigt, nach der Gründung gemäss einem noch zu erstellenden Vertrag das Grundstück Nr. 5801, Grundbuch Davos, sowie gemäss einer noch zu erstellenden Liste das Gross- und Kleininventar in diesem Grundstück zum Preis von höchstens CHF 1'100'000.00 zu übernehmen.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 21.09.2017 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Keller, Reto, von Konolfingen, in Davos, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Flury, Georg, von Klosters-Serneus, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ris, Sabrina, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.