Address
c/o BD Gérance SA, succursale de Romont
Place Saint-Jacques 51
1680 Romont FR
Reports for SI Pra d'Amont SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SI Pra d'Amont SA
- SI Pra d'Amont SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Romont FR. SI Pra d'Amont SA belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 07.04.2017, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-102.149.731.
- Baronimmo SA, BD Gérance SA, succursale de Romont, Coopérative d'habitation et de rénovation foncière Le Soleil Levant have the same address as SI Pra d'Amont SA.
Management (3)
newest board members
Philippe Paul Thalmann,
André Ulysse Bernard Magne,
Pierre-André Defferrard
newest authorized signatories
Philippe Paul Thalmann,
André Ulysse Bernard Magne,
Pierre-André Defferrard
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.09.1993
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Romont (FR)
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.137.693-7
UID/VAT
CHE-102.149.731
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Effectuer des opérations de représentation, d'achat, de vente, de courtage et de gérance de tous biens immobiliers; réaliser tous plans, projets et plans financiers pour l'exécution de travaux de construction; exécuter ou faire exécuter et surveiller tous travaux de construction; fournir tous conseils techniques; importer, exporter et distribuer des matériaux, des éléments de construction et des installations, y compris tous accessoires et objets annexes.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ECA Experts Comptables Associés S.A. | Fribourg | <2004 | 30.01.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SI Pra d'Amont SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3455915, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
S.I. Pra d'Amont SA, à Romont (FR), CHE-102.149.731 (FOSC du 09.06.2016, p. 0/2879967).
Nouvelle adresse:
Place Saint-Jacques 51, c/o BD Gérance SA, succursale de Romont, 1680 Romont FR.
Publication number: 2879967, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
S.I. Pra d'Amont SA, à Romont (FR), CHE-102.149.731 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826).
Nouvelle adresse:
Avenue Gérard Clerc 6, c/o FIDUCIMMO S.A., 1680 Romont FR. Jeckelmann Joseph et Wider Roland ne sont plus administrateurs, leur signature est radiée. Thalmann Philippe, administrateur, nom précis Thalmann Philippe Paul, n'est plus secrétaire, mais nommé président avec signature collective à deux. Magne André, nom précis Magne André Ulysse Bernard, originaire de Vuisternens-devant-Romont et domicilié à Corpataux-Magnedens, n'est plus président, mais reste administrateur avec signature collective à deux. Defferrard Pierre André, de Villorsonnens, à Bulle, est nommé administrateur avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 6009336, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
S.I. Pra d'Amont SA, à Romont (FR), CH-217-0137693-7, effectuer des opérations de représentation, etc. (FOSC du 01.02.2007, p. 6).
Nouvelle adresse:
Avenue Gérard-Clerc 6, c/o FONCIA Glâne, succursale de FONCIA Fribourg SA, 1680 Romont FR. Statuts modifiés le 11.01.2011.
Communication aux actionnaires:
lettre recommandée, remise de lettre en mains propres, télécopie, courrier électronique ou FOSC. La clause statutaire relative à la reprise de biens envisagée et à l'apport du 31.08.1993 est abrogée. ECA Experts Comptables Associés SA n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 11.01.2011, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.