Reports for Seven Doors Lobbying SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Seven Doors Lobbying SA
- Seven Doors Lobbying SA has its legal headquarters in Henniez and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Trading with various goods».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 13.07.2009.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 29.04.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-114.961.917.
- Companies with an identical address: Henniez-Beauté SA, La Vallée SPA Management Sàrl, PROTON CAPITAL (SUISSE) SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.07.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Henniez
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.058.609-0
UID/VAT
CHE-114.961.917
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'achat, la vente et la gestion de participations dans des entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, la gestion de patrimoine, la défense de ses propres intérêts et des intérêts de tiers, ainsi que la prestation de service de toutes natures dans ces domaines (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Seven Doors Lobbying AG
- Seven Doors Lobbying Ltd
- SEVEN DOORS HOLDING Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
SWISS PROVENTUM | 15.07.2024 | active | 07168/2024 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Seven Doors Lobbying SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: SB02-0000029514, Commercial Registry Office Vaud
Rubrique: Poursuites pour dettes Sous-rubrique: Commandement de payer Date de publication: SHAB 29.04.2022 Publications supplémentaires: KABVD 29.04.2022 Date d'échéance prévue: 29.04.2023 Numéro de publication: Entité de publication Offices des poursuites du district de la Broye - Vully, Rue de la Gare 45, 1530 Payerne Commandement de payer Seven Doors Lobbying SA Débiteurs: Seven Doors Lobbying SA CHE-114.961.917 Route des Bains 7
Point de contact: Offices des poursuites du district de la Broye - Vully Rue de la Gare 45
Publication number: HR02-1005201157, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Seven Doors Lobbying SA, à Henniez, CHE-114.961.917 (FOSC du 21.03.2019, p. 0/1004593343). Le 1er mai 2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives. Les statuts de la société n'ont pas encore été adaptés à la conversion, mais devront l'être lors de la prochaine modification.
Capital-actions:
CHF 700'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 700'000, divisé en 7'000 actions nominatives de CHF 100.
Publication number: HR02-1004593343, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Seven Doors Lobbying SA, à Eclépens, CHE-114.961.917 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Statuts modifiés le 12 mars 2019. Siège transféré à Henniez.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route des Bains 7, 1525 Henniez. Khetib Abdelkrim n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Bornand Stéphane, maintenant à Henniez, lequel n'est plus vice-président, reste seul administrateur et continue à signer individuellement.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.