Reports for sertis engineering GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout sertis engineering GmbH
- sertis engineering GmbH has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 08.12.2008.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 10.10.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-114.622.125.
- On the same address there are 19 other active companies registered. These include: a&o kreston ag, a&o kreston audit ag, Airica AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.12.2008
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.039.104-9
UID/VAT
CHE-114.622.125
CHE-336.688.895 VAT
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung eines Ingenieurbüros Haustechnik. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: sertis engineering GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005856463, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
sertis engineering GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-114.622.125, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2022, Publ. 1005591041).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Seiler, Xander Georg, von Dietikon, in Kerns, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Peter, Martin, von Wiesendangen, in Walenstadt, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005591041, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
sertis engineering GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-114.622.125, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 22.10.2021, Publ. 1005317983).
Domizil neu:
Bändliweg 20, 8048 Zürich.
Publication number: HR02-1005317983, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
sertis engineering GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-114.622.125, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 15.07.2021, Publ. 1005249631).
Statutenänderung:
30.08.2021.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
RMB Group AG (CHE-393.422.229), in Luzern, Gesellschafterin, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 8'000.00 und mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 6'000.00;
Wobmann, Kurt, von Zürich, in Wettswil am Albis, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 6'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 8'000.00];
Marti, Andreas, von Grossaffoltern, in Tuggen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Seiler, Xander Georg, von Dietikon, in Kerns, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.