Address
Chemin de la Vignette 5
1167 Lussy-sur-Morges
Reports for Sennwald Architectes SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sennwald Architectes SA
- Sennwald Architectes SA has its legal headquarters in Lussy-sur-Morges and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 22.06.2017.
- The last commercial register change was made on 27.11.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-249.018.580.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: 3S designers SA, JOMOS Protection Incendie SA, La Rochelle Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.06.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lussy-sur-Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.174.714-9
UID/VAT
CHE-249.018.580
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'un bureau d'architectes et de design (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sennwald Architectes SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005894815, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sennwald Architectes SA, à Lussy-sur-Morges, CHE-249.018.580 (FOSC du 10.07.2017, p. 0/3634895). Sennwald Daniel n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: 3634895, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sennwald Architectes SA, à Lussy-sur-Morges, CHE-249.018.580 (FOSC du 27.06.2017, p. 0/3605713).
Rectificatif:
l'inscription n° 10374 du 22.06.2017 (FOSC du 27.06.2017, p. 0/3605713) est rectifiée en ce sens que le président du conseil d'administration est Sennwald Jean-Marc (et non Sennwald Daniel comme publié).
Publication number: 3605713, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sennwald Architectes SA, à Lussy-sur-Morges, chemin de la Vignette 5, 1167 Lussy-sur-Morges, CHE-249.018.580. Nouvelle société anonyme.
Statuts:
8 juin 2017.
But:
la société a pour but l'exploitation d'un bureau d'architectes et de design (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100'000 actions nominatives de CHF 1, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts.
Reprise de biens envisagée:
certains actifs et passifs de la société 'Sennwald SA' (CHE-107.034.236), à Lussy-sur-Morges, pour CHF 226'881.63 au maximum.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Administration:
Sennwald Daniel, à Lussy-sur-Morges, président, Sennwald Oppliger Alexandra, à Lonay, vice-présidente, et Sennwald Jean-Marc, à Lonay, tous trois de La Chaux-du-Milieu, chacun avec signature collective à deux. Selon déclaration du 8 juin 2017, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.