Reports for Schweizerisches Rotes Kreuz Kanton Zug
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schweizerisches Rotes Kreuz Kanton Zug
- Schweizerisches Rotes Kreuz Kanton Zug has its legal headquarters in Baar, is active and operates in the sector «Other social services».
- The organization was founded on 07.12.2016.
- On the 15.04.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-100.591.464.
- On the same address as Schweizerisches Rotes Kreuz Kanton Zug there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: African Greenland Safaris & Travel GmbH, BURKARD DESIGN GmbH, Karl Moos, Immobilienverwaltung.
Management (5)
newest members of the committee
Christian Jürg Hofstetter,
Prof. Dr. Brigitta Margrit Eriksson-Hotz,
Ayla Meier-Dolasir,
Simona Wöhrle
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Stefanie Maria Holm-Lustenberger,
Prof. Dr. Brigitta Margrit Eriksson-Hotz,
Ayla Meier-Dolasir
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.12.2016
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Baar
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.6.000.333-8
UID/VAT
CHE-100.591.464
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Mitwirken bei der Erfüllung der Aufgaben des Schweizerischen Roten Kreuzes; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Keller Stalder Partner AG | Baar | 12.12.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schweizerisches Rotes Kreuz Kantonalverband Zug
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schweizerisches Rotes Kreuz Kanton Zug
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006008687, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Schweizerisches Rotes Kreuz Kanton Zug, in Baar, CHE-100.591.464, Verein (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 27.03.2024, Publ. 1005995733).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bellwald, Stephan, von Zürich, in Horgen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005995733, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Schweizerisches Rotes Kreuz Kanton Zug, in Baar, CHE-100.591.464, Verein (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 28.12.2023, Publ. 1005921673).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holm, Stefanie, von Wolhusen, in Udligenswil, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005921673, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Schweizerisches Rotes Kreuz Kanton Zug, in Baar, CHE-100.591.464, Verein (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2023, Publ. 1005796815).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dunn, Natalia, von Weggis, in Zug, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Hagmann, Hans, von Däniken, in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.