Address
c/o Dr. Otto Brändli
Hömelstrasse 15
8636 Wald ZH
Reports for Schweizerische Lungenstiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schweizerische Lungenstiftung
- Schweizerische Lungenstiftung with its legal headquarters in Wald ZH is active. Schweizerische Lungenstiftung operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management of the organization Schweizerische Lungenstiftung consists of 7 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 29.12.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Schweizerische Lungenstiftung is the following: CHE-101.876.053.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Gabriela Meyer,
Hans Scherrer,
Dr. Jakob Walter,
Johann Kurmann,
Pieter Langloh
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.06.1988
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Wald (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.903.183-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.876.053
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Bekämpfung und Verhütung von Tuberkulose und Lungenkrankheiten aller Art sowie deren Erforschung, namentlich durch die Förderung von wissenschaftlichen Arbeiten auf dem Gebiete der Sozial- und Präventivmedizin. Dies soll zum Wohle der Allgemeinheit wie auch einzelner Betroffener geschehen, prophylaktisch und im akuten Falle. Der Stiftungszweck soll vom Stiftungsrat mit allen verhältnismässigen Mitteln und Wegen verfolgt werden, insbesondere durch die Gewährung von Beiträgen oder die volle Kostendeckung betreffend. Projekte der Grundlagenforschung sowie der klinischen Forschung im Bereich der Tuberkulose und der Lungenkrankheiten, durch Leistungen an Institute und/oder forschungsbeteiligte Personen, die Ausbildung, Fortbildung oder Weiterbildung von Ärzten und allen andern im Bereich der Gesundheitspflege beruflich tätigen Personen und Institutionen, einschliesslich deren Teilnahme an Fach- und ähnlichen Veranstaltungen jeder Art; die Organisation von Fach- und ähnlichen Veranstaltungen wie Kongressen, Seminaren oder Vorträgen, sowie aufklärender Veranstaltungen für die Allgemeinheit; die Anschaffung, Verlegung und Verbreitung von Bildungs- und Dokumentationsmaterialien aller Art für Fachkreise wie auch für die Allgemeinheit; die Erstellung und Führung von Krankenhäusern, -heimen oder -abteilungen und anderen Institutionen für Lungenkranke; die Übernahme von Kosten für Untersuchungen, ambulante Behandlungen und Therapien sowie Spital- oder Heimaufenthalte und/oder andere ausserordentliche, krankheitsbedingte Lebenshaltungskosten von finanziell bedürftigen Lungenkranken; Die Stiftung verfolgt weder Erwerbs- noch Selbsthilfezwecke.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ryser Revision AG | Zürich | 29.12.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RevConsult Treuhand AG | Zug | 14.10.2015 | 28.12.2023 | |
Budliger Treuhand AG | Zürich | 24.09.2009 | 13.10.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Swiss Lung Foundation
- Fondazione Polmonare Svizzera
- Fondation Pulmonaire Suisse
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schweizerische Lungenstiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005922797, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schweizerische Lungenstiftung, in Wald (ZH), CHE-101.876.053, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2021, Publ. 1005319791).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
RevConsult Treuhand AG (CHE-105.474.096), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyer, Gabriella, von Villmergen, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Ryser Revision AG (CHE-103.724.827), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005319791, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schweizerische Lungenstiftung, in Wald (ZH), CHE-101.876.053, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 14.10.2015, S.0, Publ. 2425633).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Honegger, Beat, von Wald ZH, in Wald ZH, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 2425633, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schweizerische Lungenstiftung, in Wald ZH, CHE-101.876.053, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2015, Publ. 1945149).
Domizil neu:
c/o Dr. Otto Brändli, Hömelstrasse 15, 8636 Wald ZH. [Gestrichene Angaben über die Organisation aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 95 HRegV.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wegmann, Raymond, von Lindau, in Wald ZH, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Quästor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Budliger Treuhand AG (CHE-103.622.262), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scherrer, Hans, von Kirchberg SG, in Illnau-Effretikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Quästor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
RevConsult Treuhand AG (CHE-105.474.096), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.