Address
Somvih 27, Sportzentrum Purtum
7524 Zuoz
Reports for Schweizer Skischule Zuoz / La Punt AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schweizer Skischule Zuoz / La Punt AG
- Schweizer Skischule Zuoz / La Punt AG with its legal headquarters in Zuoz is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Other services in education». Schweizer Skischule Zuoz / La Punt AG is active.
- The management of the company Schweizer Skischule Zuoz / La Punt AG consists of 5 persons.
- On the 06.02.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-104.079.521.
Management (5)
newest board members
Ramun Ratti,
Anna Barbara Reinalter,
Christian Wolf,
Duri Campell
newest authorized signatories
Ramun Ratti,
Anna Barbara Reinalter,
Gudench Campell,
Christian Wolf,
Duri Campell
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.01.1998
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zuoz
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.006.283-6
UID/VAT
CHE-104.079.521
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer alpinen Skischule und eines Restaurants; die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und Grundstücke erwerben, verkaufen und belasten.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Delnon Treuhand & Revisionen | Zuoz | 29.12.2015 | 09.01.2020 | |
Valär Treuhand | Zuoz | <2004 | 28.12.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schweizer Skischule Zuoz/La Punt AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schweizer Skischule Zuoz / La Punt AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005670850, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Schweizer Skischule Zuoz / La Punt AG, in Zuoz, CHE-104.079.521, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 20.01.2023, Publ. 1005657845).
Domizil neu:
Sportzentrum Purtum, Somvih 27, 7524 Zuoz [Behördliche Umadressierung].
Publication number: HR02-1005657845, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Schweizer Skischule Zuoz / La Punt AG, in Zuoz, CHE-104.079.521, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2020, Publ. 1004801472).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wieser, Luis A., von Zuoz und Tarasp, in Zuoz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ratti, Ramun, von Madulain, in Zuoz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004801472, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Schweizer Skischule Zuoz/La Punt AG, in Zuoz, CHE-104.079.521, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 29.12.2015, S.0, Publ. 2570799).
Statutenänderung:
20.12.2019.
Firma neu:
Schweizer Skischule Zuoz / La Punt AG.
Aktien neu:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[Die Bestimmung über die Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme bei der Gründung ist aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.] [gestrichen: Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung vom 07.01.1998 gemäss Bilanz per 30.06.1997 vom Tourismusverein Zuoz/La Punt sämtliche Aktiven von CHF 268'399.35 und Passiven von CHF 216'600.--, wofür 50 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben und CHF 1'799.35 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.]. Gemäss Erklärung vom 20.12.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Toutsch, Peider Andri, von Zernez, in Zernez, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Delnon Treuhand & Revisionen (CHE-112.219.830), in Zuoz, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reinalter, Anna Barbara, von Zernez, in Zernez, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.