Reports for Schüpbach Ingenieure AG, Zweigniederlassung Oberrohrdorf
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schüpbach Ingenieure AG, Zweigniederlassung Oberrohrdorf
- Schüpbach Ingenieure AG, Zweigniederlassung Oberrohrdorf is active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Oberrohrdorf.
- The company was founded on 28.09.1995 and has 0 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 24.12.2020.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-353.663.790.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.09.1995
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberrohrdorf
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.9.016.927-2
UID/VAT
CHE-353.663.790
CHE-105.898.421 VAT
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Bauingenieurbüros für Hoch- und Tiefbau; die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schüpbach Ingenieure AG, Zweigniederlassung Oberrohrdorf
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005058071, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schüpbach Ingenieure AG, Zweigniederlassung Oberrohrdorf, in Oberrohrdorf, CHE-353.663.790, schweizerische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 01.05.2012, S.0, Publ. 6660080).
Hauptsitz in:
Buchs (AG).
Domizil neu:
Brüggliacher 31, 5452 Oberrohrdorf.
Publication number: 6660080, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schüpbach Ingenieure AG, Zweigniederlassung Oberrohrdorf, in Oberrohrdorf, CH-400.9.016.927-2, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 28.02.2003, S. 2, Publ. 884060).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Buchs AG.
Neue Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CHE-105.898.421 [CH-400.3.016.689-6].
Registrierung Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichenes Eintragsdatum am Hauptsitz aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV] [bisher: Eingetragen im HRG am HS: 21.06.1995].Zweck Hauptsitz neu: [Gestrichene Personenangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Gestrichene Personenangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schüpbach, Maria, von Arni BE, in Oberrohrdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schüpbach, Felix, von Arni BE, in Schinznach Bad, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schüpbach, Walter, von Arni BE, in Oberrohrdorf, Mitglied und Leiter der Zweigniederlassung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Koch, René, von Triengen, in Reitnau, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 884060, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schüpbach Ingenieure AG, Zweigniederlassung Oberrohrdorf, in Oberrohrdorf, Betrieb eines Bauingenieurbüros für Hoch- und Tiefbau, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 16.09.1998, S. 6408).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Buchs AG.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schüpbach, Felix, von Arni BE, in Schinznach Bad, Präsident und Delegierter, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Baden, Delegierter];
Schüpbach, Walter, von Arni BE, in Oberrohrdorf, Mitglied und Leiter der Zweigniederlassung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident und Leiter der Zweigniederlassung];
Koch, René, von Triengen, in Reitnau, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.