Reports for Schneider Planung und Beratung AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schneider Planung und Beratung AG
- Schneider Planung und Beratung AG is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Oberwil BL.
- The management of the company Schneider Planung und Beratung AG consists of 6 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 18.05.1995.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 19.07.2017. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Schneider Planung und Beratung AG is registered in the Canton of BL under the UID CHE-108.292.858.
- There are 3 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: irriloc AG, Schneider Gartengestaltung AG, Schneider Service AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Manuel Kleinmann,
Markus Winter,
Jean-Claude Kleinmann,
Anton Andreas Bellwald,
Suzanne Kleinmann
newest authorized signatories
Manuel Kleinmann,
Markus Winter,
Jean-Claude Kleinmann,
Anton Andreas Bellwald,
Suzanne Kleinmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.05.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberwil (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.000.789-7
UID/VAT
CHE-108.292.858
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen und Übernahme von Managementaufgaben, Finanzierung von Tochtergesellschaften sowie Gewährung von Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten solcher Tochtergesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann auch Rechte erwerben und Lizenzen verwerten, sich an gleichen oder ähnlichen Betrieben beteiligen und solche gründen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Santschi & Partner Treuhand AG | Reinach (BL) | 03.01.2013 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rinaco Treuhand AG | Reinach (BL) | 07.12.2005 | 02.01.2013 | |
Urs Baumann & Partner AG | Reinach (BL) | 08.11.2005 | 06.12.2005 | |
Revibal Treuhandgesellschaft AG | Basel | <2004 | 08.08.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- JCK-Holding AG
- Ane Kenssen Mode & Design AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schneider Planung und Beratung AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3654227, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Schneider Planung und Beratung AG, in Oberwil (BL), CHE-108.292.858, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2016, Publ. 3233957).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kleinmann, Manuel, von Basel, in Hésingue (FR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3233957, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
JCK-Holding AG, in Oberwil (BL), CHE-108.292.858, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 49 vom 12.03.2013, Publ. 7100470).
Statutenänderung:
07.12.2016.
Firma neu:
Schneider Planung und Beratung AG.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Winter, Markus, von Zürich und Kaisten, in Biel-Benken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Dornach];
Santschi & Partner Treuhand AG (CHE-107.545.502), in Reinach (BL), Revisionsstelle [bisher: Santschi & Partner Treuhand AG].
Publication number: 7100470, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
JCK-Holding AG, in Oberwil BL, CH-270.3.000.789-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2013, Publ. 7063676).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Winter, Markus, von Kaisten und Zürich, in Dornach, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.