Reports for SchmidtColleg AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SchmidtColleg AG
- SchmidtColleg AG is active in the industry «Services regarding management consulting» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Galgenen.
- SchmidtColleg AG was founded on 21.12.2005.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 28.06.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company SchmidtColleg AG is the following: CHE-112.692.942.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.12.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Galgenen
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.058.519-7
UID/VAT
CHE-112.692.942
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen, insbesondere in den Bereichen Lebensführung, Unternehmensführung bis zur Menschenführung; das Leistungsangebot umfasst Durchführen und Entwickeln von Seminaren, Workshops, Lehrwerken; Handel mit Produkten die den Unternehmenszweck fördern und unterstützen. Sie kann nebst der Marktbearbeitung in der Schweiz, Generalvertetungen übernehmen, Unternehmen aller Art erwerben oder errichten. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revidas Revisionsgesellschaft AG | St. Gallen | 28.12.2005 | 19.05.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SchmidtColleg AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006069864, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
SchmidtColleg AG, in Galgenen, CHE-112.692.942, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 20.05.2015, S.0, Publ. 2160925).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und des Fremdkapitals der Tyra AG, in Galgenen (CHE-113.283.523), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 18.06.2024 und Bilanz per 31.12.2023. Aktiven von CHF 1'208'133.40 und Fremdkapital von CHF 652'478.27 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: 2160925, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
SchmidtColleg AG, in Galgenen, CHE-112.692.942, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2013, Publ. 987549). Gemäss Erklärung vom 01.04.2015 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Revidas Revisionsgesellschaft AG (CH-320.3.024.151-6), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 987549, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
SchmidtColleg AG, bisher in St. Gallen, CH-320.3.058.519-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2011, Publ. 6286310).
Gründungsstatuten:
19.12.2005.
Statutenänderung:
12.07.2013.
Sitz neu:
Galgenen.
Domizil neu:
Im Stöckli 45, 8854 Galgenen. [Weitere Statutenänderungen nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Belz, Otto, von Egnach, in Gais, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.