Reports for Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieure und Planer
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieure und Planer
- Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieure und Planer with its legal headquarters in Nidau is active. Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieure und Planer operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The company was founded on 21.02.1975.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 20.11.2020. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieure und Planer is the following: CHE-102.447.996.
Management (5)
newest board members
Executive board
Thomas Hofmann,
René Leupi,
Christoph Knüsel-Heller,
Stefanie Gygax,
Hanspeter Schlegel
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Hofmann,
René Leupi,
Christoph Knüsel-Heller,
Stefanie Gygax,
Hanspeter Schlegel
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.02.1975
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Nidau
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.006.193-2
UID/VAT
CHE-102.447.996
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung eines Ingenieurbüros für Planungen im gesamten Bau- und Umweltbereich. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, verwandte Geschäftszweige angliedern oder errichten, Lizenzen, Patente und immaterielle Werte übernehmen. Sie kann Liegenschaften erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidra-Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | 02.05.2011 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Arc Fiduciaire Grand Chasseral SA | Corgémont | <2004 | 01.05.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieurbüro für Hoch- und Tiefbau.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieure und Planer
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005027704, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieure und Planer, in Nidau, CHE-102.447.996, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 30.12.2014, S.0, Publ. 1907363).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Urs, von Basadingen-Schlattingen und Biel/Bienne, in Twann (Twann-Tüscherz), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leupi, René, von Dagmersellen, in Port, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsident, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hofmann, Thomas, von Schüpfen, in Worben, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gygax, Stefanie, von Twann-Tüscherz, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied und Sekretärin des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Knüsel-Heller, Christoph, von Zürich, in Kappelen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1907363, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieure und Planer, in Nidau, CHE-102.447.996, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2011, Publ. 6143708).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pletscher,Hans Martin, von Schaffhausen und Schleitheim, in Brügg bei Biel (Brügg), Vizepräsident und Sekretär, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leupi, René, von Dagmersellen, in Port, Vizepräsident und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift];
Gygax, Stefanie, von Twann-Tüscherz, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied und Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hofmann, Thomas, von Schüpfen, in Worben, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schlegel, Hanspeter, von Grindelwald, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fidra-Treuhand AG (CHE-107.175.374), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Fidra-Treuhand AG (CH-073.3.000.754-6)].
Publication number: 6143708, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Schmid & Pletscher AG, Ingenieure und Planer, in Nidau, CH-073.3.006.193-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 25.03.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6092890).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
FJ Fiduciaire SA, in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fidra-Treuhand AG (CH-073.3.000.754-6), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.