Address
c/o Aleansa Holding AG
Windenweg 11
6345 Neuheim
Reports for Schlumpf-Verwaltungs-AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schlumpf-Verwaltungs-AG
- Schlumpf-Verwaltungs-AG has its legal headquarters in Neuheim and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 27.12.2021.
- The company's UID is CHE-100.582.459.
Management (4)
newest board members
Margrit Anliker Schlumpf,
Bernadette Reding-Schlumpf,
Andreas Michael Otto Josef Schlumpf,
Florian Schlumpf-Gruber
newest authorized signatories
Margrit Anliker Schlumpf,
Bernadette Reding-Schlumpf,
Andreas Michael Otto Josef Schlumpf,
Florian Schlumpf-Gruber
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.04.1984
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Neuheim
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.010.272-9
UID/VAT
CHE-100.582.459
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit und Verwaltung von Grundstücken im In- und Ausland; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CONTRAST Revision AG | Zug | 16.02.2010 | 25.09.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schlumpf-Verwaltungs-AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005368504, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Schlumpf-Verwaltungs-AG, in Neuheim, CHE-100.582.459, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 08.12.2016, Publ. 3209991).
Statutenänderung:
08.12.2021.
Aktien neu:
25 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 500.00 und 75 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 500.00 (Vorzugsaktien) [bisher: 100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 500.00].
Statutarische Vorrechte neu:
Die Vorzugsaktien gewähren Vorrechte bezüglich Dividende gemäss Statuten. [Ferner Änderung einer nicht publikationspflichtigen Tatsache.]
Publication number: 3209991, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Schlumpf-Verwaltungs-AG, in Neuheim, CHE-100.582.459, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 21.04.2016, Publ. 2792015).
Domizil neu:
c/o Aleansa Holding AG, Windenweg 11, 6345 Neuheim.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schlumpf, Hans, von Steinhausen, in Neuheim, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2792015, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Schlumpf-Verwaltungs-AG, in Neuheim, CHE-100.582.459, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2013, Publ. 1095741).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reding, Oskar, von Arth, in Burg AG, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Anliker Schlumpf, Margrit, von Steinhausen, in Steinhausen, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Reding-Schlumpf, Bernadette, von Arth, in Burg AG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.