Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o Oskar Fluri
Fegetz-Allee 4
4500 Solothurn
Reports for Schilling-Arnold-Stiftung in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.12.1917
Deletion from the commercial register
06.02.2024
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Solothurn
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-260.7.000.003-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.387.089
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erstens: Rekonvaleszenten aus schwerer Krankheit, welche wegen Armut nicht die Mitteln haben, sich das Notwendige zur ihrer Genesung zu verschaffen; zweitens; Familien, deren Vater und Ernährer in der kantonalen Zwangsarbeitsanstalt untergebracht werden müssen; und drittens; hilflose Greise beiderlei Geschlechtes, welche infolge Krankheit und Altersschwäche sich den notwendigen Lebensunterhalt nicht mehr erwerben können, durch Lebensmittel und Geldbeiträge zu unterstützen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
GSW Revisions AG | Solothurn | 04.08.2020 | 05.02.2024 | |
sol-tax treuhand GmbH | Luterbach | 15.06.2010 | 05.07.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schilling-Arnold-Stiftung
- Schilling- Arnold-Stiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schilling-Arnold-Stiftung in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005953758, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Schilling-Arnold-Stiftung in Liquidation, in Solothurn, CHE-110.387.089, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 24.06.2022, Publ. 1005504015). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Stiftung wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005504015, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Schilling-Arnold-Stiftung, in Solothurn, CHE-110.387.089, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 08.12.2021, Publ. 1005352131).
Name neu:
Schilling-Arnold-Stiftung in Liquidation.
Weitere Adressen:
Liquidationsadresse: bei Urs Bentz, Staalenhof 2, 4513 Langendorf. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Beschluss der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 24.05.2022 aufgehoben.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vidal, Carlos, von Solothurn, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Senti, Domenika, von Flums, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Walter, Pascal, von Solothurn, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bargetzi, Kurt, von Solothurn, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Salvetti, Ida, von Solothurn, in Oberdorf SO, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fluri, Oskar, von Solothurn und Herbetswil, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Giani-Zanetti, Franca, von Poschiavo und Luzern, in Langendorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Meier, Peter-Lukas, von Solothurn, in Biberist, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schwaller, Antoinette, von Kammersrohr, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bentz, Urs, von Basel, in Langendorf, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005352131, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Schilling-Arnold-Stiftung, in Solothurn, CHE-110.387.089, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 01.09.2021, Publ. 1005281941).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bargetzi, Kurt, von Solothurn, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].