Reports for Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH
- Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH in Basel is a Limited liability company from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH is active.
- The management of the company Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH, which was founded on the 17.12.1998, consists of 3 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 05.08.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-104.947.264.
- Companies with the same address as Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH: Herrmann + Partner Energietechnik GmbH, LKK Planung GmbH.
Management (3)
newest authorized signatories
Cornelia Beugger Wipf-Schwab,
Ronald Schneider,
Martin Scherrer
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.12.1998
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.4.001.605-1
UID/VAT
CHE-104.947.264
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005535794, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH, in Basel, CHE-104.947.264, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2019, Publ. 1004770127).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sandrini, Riccardo, von Flums-Grossberg, in Basel, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scherrer, Martin, von Stein (SG), in Basel, Geschäftsführer, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Beugger Wipf, Cornelia, von Basel, in Muri (AG), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004770127, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH, in Basel, CHE-104.947.264, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2016, S.0, Publ. 2936355).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schneider, Ronald, von Giebenach, in Giebenach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2936355, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Scherrer + Partner Dienstleistungen für die Haus- und Energietechnik GmbH, in Basel, CHE-104.947.264, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 102 vom 31.05.2010, S. 7, Publ. 5652698).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scherrer, Martin, von Stein SG, in Basel, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung und Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: von Stein SG, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift];
Sandrini, Riccardo, von Flums-Grossberg, in Basel, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.