Reports for SCB Future AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SCB Future AG
- SCB Future AG is active in the industry «Other services in education» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Bern.
- There are 9 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 10.09.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-109.897.828.
- There are 6 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: BEEF2go AG, Bernische Eishockey Stiftung, Hockey Physio GmbH.
Management (9)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Martin Plüss,
Patrik Bärtschi,
Carlo Stephan Bommes,
Pascal Signer,
Stefan Moser
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.11.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.031.105-0
UID/VAT
CHE-109.897.828
CHE-116.306.764 VAT
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt, Jugendlichen aus der Region Bern und der übrigen Schweiz die Ausübung des Eishockey-Sports zu ermöglichen sowie die Förderung des Nachwuchs im Eishockeysport. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben, pachten oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder welche direkt oder indirekt mit diesem im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SCB Future AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006125722, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SCB Future AG, in Bern, CHE-109.897.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 23.05.2024, Publ. 1006037722).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Streit, Mark, von Wald (BE), in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006037722, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SCB Future AG, in Bern, CHE-109.897.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 27.09.2023, Publ. 1005846553).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ebbett, Andrew Murray Brian, kanadischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bärtschi, Patrik, von Adelboden, in Niederweningen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Plüss, Martin, von Murgenthal, in Bern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005846553, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SCB Future AG, in Bern, CHE-109.897.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 23.05.2023, Publ. 1005751498).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bommes, Carlo Stephan, von Köniz, in Gümligen (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.