AddressRingstrasse 24a8317 Tagelswangen |
Unlock additional contact details such as phone, website or email address |
About
Sartorius Stedim Switzerland AG
- Sartorius Stedim Switzerland AG in Tagelswangen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof». Sartorius Stedim Switzerland AG is active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 15.04.1999.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 12.07.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-105.110.599.
ManagementSource: SOGC |
newest board members |
newest authorized signatoriesFrançois Ernest Himmelspach, |
Executive board |
Network
View network in detail
Informationen aus dem HandelsregisterSource: SOGC |
|
Entry in the commercial register15.04.1999 |
|
Legal formCompany limited by shares (AG) |
|
Legal headquarters of the companyLindau |
Commercial Registry OfficeZH |
Commercial register numberCH-020.3.021.743-5 |
|
UID/VATCHE-105.110.599 |
|
SectorManufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof |
|
Purpose (Original language)Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Produktion, die Forschung und Entwicklung, den Handel, den Vertrieb und das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen, Anlagen, Produkten und Zubehör auf dem Gebiet der Biotechnologie im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Immaterialgüterrechte, technische und administrative Kenntnisse erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie technische und administrative Beratungsdienste leisten. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich im In- und Ausland an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Sie kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann auch alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft ist befugt, Finanzierungs-, Sanierungs- und Interzessionsmassnahmen zu Gunsten von Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten vorzunehmen, sowie Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten Darlehen oder für deren Verpflichtungen Sicherheiten zu gewähren. |
AuditorSource: SOGC |
|
Current auditor (1) |
|
Former auditor (2) |
Other company namesSource: SOGC |
|
Past and translated company names
|
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sartorius Stedim Switzerland AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006082622, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sartorius Stedim Switzerland AG, in Lindau, CHE-105.110.599, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 62 vom 28.03.2024, Publ. 1005996587).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Precht, Tobias, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Göttingen (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005996587, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sartorius Stedim Switzerland AG, in Lindau, CHE-105.110.599, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2023, Publ. 1005794303).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bernhard Walter, Dr. Arnold, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Stuttgart (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Himmelspach, François Ernest, von Port, in Port, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005794303, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sartorius Stedim Switzerland AG, in Lindau, CHE-105.110.599, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 20.03.2019, Publ. 1004591514).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peuker, Dr. Thorsten, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lohne (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bernhard Walter, Dr. Arnold, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Stuttgart (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.