Reports for Saatchi & Saatchi Zürich AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Saatchi & Saatchi Zürich AG
- Saatchi & Saatchi Zürich AG has its legal headquarters in Zürich, is active and operates in the sector «Advertising services».
- The management of the company Saatchi & Saatchi Zürich AG consists of 6 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 28.10.2010.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 14.11.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-116.149.186.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: MetaDesign AG, Optimedia Holding AG, Publicis Communications Schweiz AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Markus Alexander Haldemann,
Frank-Peter Daniel Lortz,
Philippe Bordet
newest authorized signatories
Jarina Olivia Sandamali Kurt-Jauch,
Frank Holger Schicke,
Markus Alexander Haldemann,
Frank-Peter Daniel Lortz,
Edgar Magyar
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.10.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.035.786-5
UID/VAT
CHE-116.149.186
Sector
Advertising services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer Werbeagentur, insbesondere die Beratung im Hinblick auf sowie die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen jeglicher Art der nationalen und internationalen Werbung, der Verkaufsförderung und des Marketings sowie die Ausübung sämtlicher damit zusammenhängender Tätigkeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie andere Unternehmen erwerben oder erworbene Unternehmen verkaufen. Sie kann Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen. Sie kann alle kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen, die der Verwirklichung ihres Zwecks förderlich sein könnten. Sie kann Darlehen aufnehmen und gewähren, Garantien und andere Sicherheiten stellen, Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwalten und verwerten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 14.11.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Vernier | 19.10.2011 | 13.11.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Saatchi & Saatchi Zurich SA
- Saatchi & Saatchi Zurich Ltd.
- Alpha 245 Ltd
- Alpha 245 SA
- Alpha 245 AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Saatchi & Saatchi Zürich AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005883911, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Saatchi & Saatchi Zürich AG, in Zürich, CHE-116.149.186, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2023, Publ. 1005736394).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
MAZARS SA (CHE-107.861.311), in Vernier, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
KPMG AG (CHE-106.084.881), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005736394, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Saatchi & Saatchi Zürich AG, in Zürich, CHE-116.149.186, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 25.01.2022, Publ. 1005388605).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
van der Touw, Peter Alexander, von Wädenswil, in Horgen, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jauch, Jarina Olivia Sandamali, von Schleitheim, in Zürich, Vizedirektorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005388605, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Saatchi & Saatchi Zürich AG, in Zürich, CHE-116.149.186, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2021, Publ. 1005323732).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumgartner Halder, Susanne Ruth, von Buochs, in Langnau am Albis, Vizedirektorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Senn, Peter, von Unterkulm, in Zürich, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schicke, Frank Holger, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.