Reports for Rutishauser AG Blumen, Pflanzen, Kulturen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rutishauser AG Blumen, Pflanzen, Kulturen
- Rutishauser AG Blumen, Pflanzen, Kulturen has its legal headquarters in Zuzwil SG and is active. It operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- Rutishauser AG Blumen, Pflanzen, Kulturen was founded on 23.03.1972.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 19.06.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SG under the UID CHE-108.732.969.
Management (7)
newest board members
Mario Breu,
Pascal Gehrer,
lic. iur. Martin Karl Gehrer,
Edith Rutishauser
newest authorized signatories
Mario Breu,
Pascal Gehrer,
lic. iur. Martin Karl Gehrer,
Edith Rutishauser,
Heidi Trudy Fitzi-Rutishauser
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.03.1972
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zuzwil (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.026.673-8
UID/VAT
CHE-108.732.969
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Produktions- und Handelsgeschäftes für Blumen und Pflanzen sowie zugehörige Artikel aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, Liegenschaften erwerben, halten und veräussern und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revisal AG Gossau | Gossau (SG) | 04.09.2009 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
advanto wirtschaftsprüfung ag | Herisau | <2004 | 03.09.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Rutishauser Gärtnerei AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rutishauser AG Blumen, Pflanzen, Kulturen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005771875, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Rutishauser AG Blumen, Pflanzen, Kulturen, in Zuzwil (SG), CHE-108.732.969, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 22.07.2016, S.0, Publ. 2969005).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kempter, Christof, von Oberbüren, in Au SG, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Breu, Mario, von Oberegg, in Rossrüti (Wil (SG)), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder einem unterschriftsberechtigten Geschäftsführer;
Gehrer, Pascal, von St. Gallen, in Weiningen ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder einem unterschriftsberechtigten Geschäftsführer.
Publication number: 2969005, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Rutishauser AG Blumen, Pflanzen, Kulturen, in Zuzwil SG, CHE-108.732.969, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 171 vom 04.09.2009, S. 13, Publ. 5230976).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rutishauser, Kurt, von Sommeri, in Züberwangen (Zuzwil), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gehrer, Martin, von St. Gallen, in Abtwil SG (Gaiserwald), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kempter, Christof, von Oberbüren, in Au SG, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rutishauser, Edith, von Sommeri, in Züberwangen (Zuzwil SG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Züberwangen (Zuzwil), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 5230976, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Rutishauser AG Blumen, Pflanzen, Kulturen, in Zuzwil SG, CH-320.3.026.673-8, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 153 vom 13.08.2003, S. 9, Publ. 1127896).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
a wp ag für wirtschaftsprüfung, in Züberwangen (Zuzwil SG), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rutishauser, Kurt, von Sommeri, in Züberwangen (Zuzwil), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift];
Rutishauser, Edith, von Sommeri, in Züberwangen (Zuzwil), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Einzelunterschrift];
Revisal AG Gossau (CH-320.3.028.093-4), in Gossau SG, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.