Reports for Romano & Christen Management AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Romano & Christen Management AG
- Romano & Christen Management AG with its legal headquarters in Luzern is active. Romano & Christen Management AG operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Romano & Christen Management AG consists of 3 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 24.06.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Romano & Christen Management AG is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-113.736.045.
- There are 15 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Burg Immobilien AG, Casalo GmbH, CH&R Immobilien AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Joel Elija Romano,
Gian-Andrea Prevost,
Markus Alois Vincenzo Romano
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.07.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.787.898-5
UID/VAT
CHE-113.736.045
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung einer Totalunternehmung; Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken; Beteiligungen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bitzi Treuhand AG | Sursee | 20.07.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Romano & Christen Management AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005227078, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Romano & Christen Management AG, in Luzern, CHE-113.736.045, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 12.04.2021, Publ. 1005146180).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Romano, Markus, von Hasle (LU), in Udligenswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Romano, Joel Elija, von Hasle (LU), in Udligenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005146180, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Romano & Christen Management AG, in Luzern, CHE-113.736.045, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 30.05.2014, S.0, Publ. 1529151).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Christen, Michael, von Wolfenschiessen, in Stans, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Romano, Markus, von Hasle (LU), in Udligenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1529151, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Romano & Christen Management AG, in Luzern, CHE-113.736.045, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 21.09.2010, S. 10, Publ. 5819600).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Prevost, Gian Andrea, von Val Müstair, in Ennetbürgen, mit Einzelprokura [bisher: in Stansstad];
Bitzi Treuhand AG (CHE-102.261.641)[CH-100.3.024.797-2], in Sursee, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Bitzi Treuhand AG, in Sursee (CH-100.3.024.797-2)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.