Reports for Roland Schmid Forstausrüstung AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Roland Schmid Forstausrüstung AG
- Roland Schmid Forstausrüstung AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Strengelbach. Roland Schmid Forstausrüstung AG belongs to the industry «Mail order and retail e-commerce» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 17.07.2008.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 27.04.2020.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Roland Schmid Forstausrüstung AG is the following: CHE-114.422.307.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.07.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Strengelbach
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.030.779-3
UID/VAT
CHE-114.422.307
Sector
Mail order and retail e-commerce
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit sowie Im- und Export von Ausrüstung und Bedarfsartikeln für die Wald- und Forstwirtschaft sowie Schutzkleidung; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich bei anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Immobilien und Wertschriften erwerben, veräussern, bewirtschaften und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen, Darlehen aufnehmen und gewähren, Garantien und andere Sicherheiten stellen sowie Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwalten und verwerten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HTO Treuhand AG | Olten | 23.07.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Roland Schmid Forstausrüstung AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004877846, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Roland Schmid Forstausrüstung AG, in Strengelbach, CHE-114.422.307, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2019, Publ. 1004554501).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grube, Dr. Gunther Heinrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bispingen-Hützel (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cohrs, Stephan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Schneverdingen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004554501, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Roland Schmid Forstausrüstung AG, in Strengelbach, CHE-114.422.307, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 28.03.2013, Publ. 7125694).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Janecke, Torben, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Oftringen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huber, Fabian, von Pfungen, in Uster, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 7125694, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Roland Schmid Forstausrüstung AG, in Strengelbach, CHE-114.422.307, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 10.02.2009, S. 3, Publ. 4871756).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grube, Heinrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bispingen-Hützel (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grube, Dr. Gunther Heinrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bispingen-Hützel (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.