Reports for STARLING FLEET HOLDING AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout STARLING FLEET HOLDING AG
- STARLING FLEET HOLDING AG has its legal headquarters in Rotkreuz and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies».
- STARLING FLEET HOLDING AG was founded on 04.08.2017.
- The last commercial register change was made on 26.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company STARLING FLEET HOLDING AG is the following: CHE-407.438.032.
- On the same address there are 123 other active companies registered. These include: Academic Finance Consulting GmbH, Allianz Suisse Generalagentur Edgar Villiger, Zweigniederlassung Hauptagentur Rotkreuz, André Habegger & Partner AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
Sascha Gill,
Robert Straubhaar,
Jelle Roelof Hendrik van der Steeg
newest authorized signatories
Sascha Gill,
Manuela Heitzler,
Marko Cuk,
Alexander Nothegger,
Daniel Peter Brian Buchmüller
Executive board
Marko Cuk,
Alexander Nothegger,
Daniel Peter Brian Buchmüller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.08.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Risch
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.041.501-4
UID/VAT
CHE-407.438.032
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Weltweites Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen an andern Unternehmen, insbesondere im Bereich von Schifffahrtsgesellschaften; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Testaris AG | Basel | 24.12.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Remaco Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Basel | 09.08.2017 | 23.12.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- STARLING FLEET HOLDING Inc.
- STARLING FLEET HOLDING SA
- ROI Holding SA
- ROI Holding AG
- ROI Holding Inc.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: STARLING FLEET HOLDING AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006113981, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
STARLING FLEET HOLDING AG, in Risch, CHE-407.438.032, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2023, Publ. 1005827693).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hien, Andreas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Berlin (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gill, Sascha, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Langen bei Bregenz (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005827693, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
STARLING FLEET HOLDING AG, in Zug, CHE-407.438.032, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 14.07.2022, Publ. 1005520771).
Statutenänderung:
06.07.2023.
Sitz neu:
Risch.
Domizil neu:
Blegistrasse 1, 6343 Rotkreuz.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Namenaktionäre erfolgen durch Brief oder per E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Personen. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Buchmüller, Daniel, von Basel, in Holziken, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Strengelbach];
Cuk, Marko, von Aesch (BL), in Kaiseraugst, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Heitzler, Manuela, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Kleinkems (DE), Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005520771, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
STARLING FLEET HOLDING AG, in Zug, CHE-407.438.032, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 30.04.2021, Publ. 1005165102).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ammann, Felix, von Thalheim an der Thur und Zürich, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.