About RITTER WEINE Aktiengesellschaft
- The management consists of 0 persons. The company was founded on 20.06.1991.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 11.07.2018.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for RITTER WEINE Aktiengesellschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 20239076, (1)
Handelsregister 11.07.2018, RITTER WEINE Aktiengesellschaft, Schaan (FL-0001.124.961-1) Aktiengesellschaft Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend: Ritter, Stephan Albert, StA: Liechtenstein, 9492 Eschen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: StA: Liechtenstein, Vaduz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Ritter, Hansjörg, StA: Liechtenstein, 9494 Schaan, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift];
Gätzi, Michael, StA: Liechtenstein, 9497 Triesenberg, stellvertretender Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 20179873, (1)
Handelsregister 21/05/2014, RITTER WEINE Aktiengesellschaft, Schaan (FL-0001.124.961-1) Aktiengesellschaft Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung: Ritter, Sarah, StA: Liechtenstein, 9494 Schaan, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 20160117, (1)
Handelsregister 06/07/2013, RITTER WEINE Aktiengesellschaft, Schaan (FL-0001.124.961-1) Aktiengesellschaft Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung: CONFIDA Treuhand- und Revisions-Aktiengesellschaft, 9490 Vaduz, Revisionsstelle.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
AREVA Allgemeine Revisions- und Treuhand Aktiengesellschaft, 9490 Vaduz, Revisionsstelle.