Reports for RGT Stahlbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout RGT Stahlbau AG
- RGT Stahlbau AG is currently active and the industry «Production of metal goods». The legal headquarters are in Kappelen.
- RGT Stahlbau AG has 4 persons entered in its management.
- On the 29.05.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-109.374.849.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Florian Sebastian Lüthi,
Roland Gerber,
Timothée Oppliger,
Juan Carlos Cancela Mira
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.02.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kappelen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.014.158-0
UID/VAT
CHE-109.374.849
Sector
Production of metal goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Handel und die Verarbeitung mit Metallen sowie technische Berechnungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FHS Fidufisc SA | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 02.03.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: RGT Stahlbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006042331, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
RGT Stahlbau AG, in Kappelen, CHE-109.374.849, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 43 vom 02.03.2023, Publ. 1005691022).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüthi, Florian Sebastian, von Rüderswil, in Schüpfen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Cancela Mira, Juan Carlos, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lyss, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005691022, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
RGT Stahlbau AG, in Kappelen, CHE-109.374.849, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 27.07.2018, Publ. 4385679).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Louis, Franziska, von Biel/Bienne und Mühleberg, in Ligerz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüthi, Florian Sebastian, von Rüderswil, in Schüpfen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Cancela Mira, Juan Carlos, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lyss, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gerber, Roland, von Langnau im Emmental, in Kappelen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Lyss, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Oppliger, Timothée, von Sigriswil, in Magglingen/Macolin (Evilard), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4385679, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
RGT Stahlbau AG, in Kappelen, CHE-109.374.849, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 11.07.2017, Publ. 3636513).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brechbühl, Claude Remo, von Wyssachen, in Biel/Bienne, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.