Reports for Renggli AG, Schötz
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Renggli AG, Schötz
- Renggli AG, Schötz is currently active and the industry «Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work». The legal headquarters are in Schötz.
- Renggli AG, Schötz has 13 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 18.06.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.804.106.
Management (13)
newest board members
Gabriela N. Devigus Minder,
Micha Tobias Renggli,
Samuel Jonas Renggli,
David Emanuel Renggli,
lic. iur. Franz Hess
newest authorized signatories
Gabriela N. Devigus Minder,
Micha Tobias Renggli,
Samuel Jonas Renggli,
David Emanuel Renggli,
Claudia Bussmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.01.1931
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schötz
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.009.112-2
UID/VAT
CHE-107.804.106
Sector
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Unternehmens in den Bereichen Holzbau und Generalunternehmung; Entwicklung, Planung, Produktion, Realisierung, Handel und Vermittlung von Bauten und ihren Bestandteilen; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum; Vornahme von Finanzierungen sowie Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Cura Treuhand AG | Luzern | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Gebr. M. & F. Renggli A.G. Schötz
- Renggli A.G. Schötz, Gebr. M. & F
- Renggli AG Schötz
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
RENGGLI | 18.05.1998 | active | 09000/1997 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Renggli AG, Schötz
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006059658, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Renggli AG, Schötz, in Schötz, CHE-107.804.106, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 29.07.2022, Publ. 1005531872).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lancetti, Michèl, von Avegno Gordevio, in Maggia, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Renggli, Andrea, von Schötz, Bretzwil und Entlebuch, in Luzern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Renggli, Maximilian, 1960, von Schötz und Entlebuch, in Luzern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Renggli, David, von Schötz und Entlebuch, in Schötz, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelprokura [bisher: in Wallisellen, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelprokura];
Devigus Minder, Gabriela, von Buochs, in Winkel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied;
Renggli, Micha, von Schötz und Entlebuch, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied;
Renggli, Samuel, von Schötz und Entlebuch, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelprokura [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelprokura].
Publication number: HR02-1005531872, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Renggli AG, Schötz, in Schötz, CHE-107.804.106, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 29.10.2021, Publ. 1005322869).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Renggli, Maximilian, 1960, von Schötz und Entlebuch, in Luzern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Schötz, Präsident, Delegierter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Renggli, David, von Schötz und Entlebuch, in Wallisellen, mit Einzelprokura;
Renggli, Samuel, von Schötz und Entlebuch, in Luzern, mit Einzelprokura;
Renggli, Andrea, von Schötz, Bretzwil und Entlebuch, in Luzern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Schötz].
Publication number: HR02-1005322869, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Renggli AG, Schötz, in Schötz, CHE-107.804.106, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 47 vom 09.03.2021, Publ. 1005118842).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Andres, Thomas-René, von Roggwil (BE), in Uerkheim, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.