Reports for RE Ventures GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout RE Ventures GmbH
- RE Ventures GmbH has its legal headquarters in Sarnen and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies».
- The company was founded on 17.06.2009.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 22.12.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.917.454.
- Companies with an identical address: Astina Haus und Bau AG, Carona Haustechnik AG, Carrier Community GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.06.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Sarnen
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.4.003.264-6
UID/VAT
CHE-114.917.454
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung von Investoren, Eigentümern, Kapitalgebern und Betreibern im Immobilienbereich, sowie die Beratung von Immobilienunternehmen. Weiter tritt die Gesellschaft als Investorin in indirekten Immobilienanlagen bzw. als Käuferin von Immobilien und Rechten an Immobilien auf. Die Tätigkeit erstreckt sich auf die Sektoren der Wohn-, Gewerbe- und Sonderimmobilien und findet europaweit statt. Nebenzwecke gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: RE Ventures GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005635711, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
RE Ventures GmbH, in Sarnen, CHE-114.917.454, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 255 vom 30.12.2021, Publ. 1005371046).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baba, Magga, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Bern, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidt, Wida, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Berlin (DE), Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005371046, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
RE Ventures GmbH, in Sarnen, CHE-114.917.454, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 06.11.2020, Publ. 1005016843).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidt, Ulrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Berlin (DE), Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Kuntze, Dr. Mario Schlomo, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005016843, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
RE Ventures GmbH, in Sarnen, CHE-114.917.454, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 14.12.2017, Publ. 3930967).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baba, Adilah, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Bad Soden am Taunus (DE), Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidt, Ulrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Berlin (DE), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Kuntze, Dr. Mario Schlomo, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.