Reports for PSK Pro Schiff Kesswil AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PSK Pro Schiff Kesswil AG
- PSK Pro Schiff Kesswil AG has its legal headquarters in Kesswil, is active and operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The company was founded on 02.05.2002 and has 3 persons in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 30.08.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-109.571.321.
Management (3)
newest board members
Anna-Lea Brunnschweiler,
Christian Emil Oberli,
Prof. Dr. Christa Maria Meyenberger
newest authorized signatories
Anna-Lea Brunnschweiler,
Christian Emil Oberli,
Prof. Dr. Christa Maria Meyenberger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.05.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kesswil
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.015.361-6
UID/VAT
CHE-109.571.321
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb resp. Vermietung und Verpachtung des Seegasthofes Schiff in Kesswil. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, Grundstücke, Beteiligungen, Wertschriften, Patente, Lizenzen und sonstige Rechte erwerben, belasten, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die der Förderung des Gesellschaftszweckes dienen oder die damit direkt oder indirekt in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trewim AG | Amriswil | 16.01.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Roth Consulting und Immobilien AG | Gottlieben | <2004 | 15.01.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PSK Pro Schiff Kesswil AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006118579, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
PSK Pro Schiff Kesswil AG, in Kesswil, CHE-109.571.321, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 22.07.2022, Publ. 1005527359). [Teils-Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stäheli, Richard, von Bürglen TG, in Uttwil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyenberger, Dr. Christa, von Bussnang, in Dozwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005527359, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2022 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 3514 vom 14.07.2022 PSK Pro Schiff Kesswil AG, in Kesswil, CHE-109.571.321, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2022, Publ. 1005524277).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunnschweiler, Anna-Lea, von Hauptwil-Gottshaus, in Kesswil, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: Brunschweiler, Anna-Lea].
Publication number: HR02-1005524277, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
PSK Pro Schiff Kesswil AG, in Kesswil, CHE-109.571.321, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 253 vom 28.12.2021, Publ. 1005370100).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kaufmann, Dr. Urs, von Gränichen, in Uttwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunschweiler, Anna-Lea, von Hauptwil-Gottshaus, in Kesswil, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.