Reports for PriMa Rent GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PriMa Rent GmbH
- PriMa Rent GmbH has its legal headquarters in Breitenbach and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Rental of machinery and movable equipment».
- The management consists of 7 persons. The company was founded on 13.05.2002.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 21.08.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SO under the UID CHE-109.584.565.
- Next to the company PriMa Rent GmbH there are 6 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Edi Haziraj's Autohandel & Werkstatt, Garage Parlak, JAA Jeger Anlage- und Apparatebau GmbH.
Management (7)
Executive board
Bruno Kiefer,
Christian Zürcher,
Bruno Markus Stettler,
Thomas Neuenschwander
newest authorized signatories
Bruno Kiefer,
Daniel Bürgi,
Christian Zürcher,
Martin Sollberger,
Bruno Markus Stettler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.05.2002
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Breitenbach
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-053.4.015.779-7
UID/VAT
CHE-109.584.565
Sector
Rental of machinery and movable equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauf, Verkauf und Vermietung von Maschinen, Geräten und weiteren Anlagen, Produktion, Einkauf, Verkauf und Vertrieb von Rohstoffen, veredelten Rohstoffen, Recyclingmaterial, Durchführung von Transporten sowie Erbringung von Engineering-Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PriMa Rent GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005820077, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
PriMa Rent GmbH, in Breitenbach, CHE-109.584.565, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 12.04.2021, Publ. 1005146439).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Bruno, von Muhen, in Hagneck, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Nater, Cédric, von Winterthur, in Aarberg, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kiefer, Bruno, von Starrkirch-Wil, in Belp, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zürcher, Christian, von Trubschachen, in Moosseedorf, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bürgi, Daniel, von Egnach, in Wünnewil-Flamatt, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005146439, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
PriMa Rent GmbH, in Breitenbach, CHE-109.584.565, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2018, Publ. 4005057).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sollberger, Martin, von Wynigen, in Burgdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4005057, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
PriMa Rent GmbH, in Breitenbach, CHE-109.584.565, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 07.03.2014, Publ. 1386115).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier, Markus, von Metzerlen-Mariastein, in Aarwangen, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Meier-Schnyder, Priska, von Metzerlen-Mariastein, in Aarwangen, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vigier Holding AG (CHE-108.326.256), in Deitingen, Gesellschafterin, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 10'000.00;
Müller, Bruno, von Muhen, in Hagneck, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, ;
Nater, Cédric, von Winterthur, in Aarberg, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Neuenschwander, Thomas, von Luterbach, in Luterbach, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stettler, Bruno, von Bolligen, in Madiswil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.