Reports for Portec AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Portec AG
- Portec AG has its legal headquarters in Aadorf and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Production of chemical products».
- The company was founded on 05.07.1991 and has 3 persons in its management.
- On the 14.04.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Portec AG is registered in the Canton of TG under the UID CHE-107.320.009.
- At the moment, the company Portec AG has 2 various trademarks or applications in the IPI database.
- Companies with an identical address: Illumate GmbH, LNS Leathernews AG, Marine Diesel Service GmbH.
Management (3)
newest board members
Christoph Constantin Hubertus Müller,
Ursina Sprenger,
Roman Gubler
newest authorized signatories
Christoph Constantin Hubertus Müller,
Ursina Sprenger,
Roman Gubler
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.07.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aadorf
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.000.928-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.320.009
Sector
Production of chemical products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Forschung, Entwicklung und Herstellung von porösen Werkstoffen und von Anlagen für die Herstellung und Verarbeitung dieser Werkstoffe sowie Handel mit diesen Werkstoffen und Anlagen; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, Lizenzen vergeben sowie Vertretungen übernehmen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Winterthur | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Portec Ltd
- Unipor AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
ESPOR | 13.02.1996 | active | 10386/1995 |
METAPOR | 30.08.1995 | active | 01924/1995 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Portec AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005724280, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Portec AG, in Aadorf, CHE-107.320.009, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 19 vom 29.01.2020, Publ. 1004817245).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sprenger, Philipp, von Winterthur und Aadorf, in Brütten, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Christoph, von Ennetbürgen, in Ennetbürgen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Sprenger, Ursina, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004817245, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Portec AG, in Aadorf, CHE-107.320.009, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 12.09.2018, Publ. 1004454192).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gubler, Roman, von Windisch, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004454192, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Portec AG, in Aadorf, CHE-107.320.009, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 48 vom 09.03.2016, Publ. 2713291).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Behnemann, Werner, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Stettfurt, Mitglied, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gubler, Roman, von Windisch, in Winterthur, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.