Reports for Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten
- Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten in Kriens is a Limited liability company from the sector «Advertising services». Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten is active.
- Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten was founded on 25.07.1997.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 10.07.2020. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten is registered under the UID CHE-108.651.331.
- Next to the company Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten there are 3 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Brauwerkstatt Kriens AG, nuevo gmbh, OHA Thomas Achermann.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.07.1997
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.020.262-1
UID/VAT
CHE-108.651.331
Sector
Advertising services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Werbe-, Grafik- und Informatikbereich; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken und Immaterialgüterrechten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Planet GmbH Werbung & Corporate Design
- Planet Kommunikation & Gestaltung GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004934054, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten, in Kriens, CHE-108.651.331, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 13.02.2020, Publ. 1004829216).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kaeser, Silvan, von Luzern, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 105 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Daniela, von Mettauertal, in Luzern, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 210 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 105 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004829216, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten, in Kriens, CHE-108.651.331, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2019, Publ. 1004692020).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Beck, Harald, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Luzern, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kaeser, Silvan, von Luzern, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 105 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 104 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Schmid, Daniela, von Mettauertal, in Luzern, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 105 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 104 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004692020, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Planet GmbH Einzigartige Markenwelten, in Kriens, CHE-108.651.331, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2018, Publ. 1004455590).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lindegger, Edmund Franz, genannt Edi, von Sursee, in Ettiswil, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 69 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kaeser, Silvan, von Luzern, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 104 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 69 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Schmid, Daniela, von Mettauertal, in Luzern, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 104 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 69 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Beck, Harald, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Luzern, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 3 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.