Reports for Pilz Industrieelektronik GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pilz Industrieelektronik GmbH
- Pilz Industrieelektronik GmbH has its legal headquarters in Mägenwil, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in IT and communications products».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 17.10.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of AG is CHE-108.672.221.
Management (4)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Manuela Bernasconi,
Pascal Fischer,
Susanne Renate Kunschert-Pilz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.09.1997
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Mägenwil
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.018.825-3
UID/VAT
CHE-108.672.221
Sector
Trading in IT and communications products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit und Montage von Steuergeräten für die Industrie, insbesondere von elektronischen Steuergeräten; kann sich an anderen Gesellschaften beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 07.10.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RF treuhand ag | Mägenwil | 24.12.2019 | 06.10.2021 | |
Baumgartner & Jordi AG | Hägendorf | 31.12.2008 | 23.12.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pilz Industrieelektronik GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005584662, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Pilz Industrieelektronik GmbH, in Mägenwil, CHE-108.672.221, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 20.05.2022, Publ. 1005478894).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mettler, Marcel, von Hemberg, in Löhningen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Eugster, Beat, von Appenzell, in Obersiggenthal, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bernasconi, Manuela, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Obersiggenthal, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005478894, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Pilz Industrieelektronik GmbH, in Mägenwil, CHE-108.672.221, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 07.10.2021, Publ. 1005307506).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Drinovac, Marijo, von Wallisellen, in Embrach, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mettler, Marcel, von Hemberg, in Löhningen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005307506, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Pilz Industrieelektronik GmbH, in Mägenwil, CHE-108.672.221, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 18.12.2020, Publ. 1005052230).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
RF treuhand ag (CHE-115.724.260), in Mägenwil, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Balmer-Etienne AG (CHE-107.252.508), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle, .
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.