Address
Teienstrasse 31, Feldmeilen
8706 Meilen
Reports for Pierre und Edeltrud Bornand-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pierre und Edeltrud Bornand-Stiftung
- Pierre und Edeltrud Bornand-Stiftung is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Meilen.
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 14.07.2022 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization Pierre und Edeltrud Bornand-Stiftung is registered under the UID CHE-114.580.685.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Lorenzo Pepe,
Dr. Eric Pierre Bornand,
Maike-Kristin Bürger,
Carmela Lucia Gina Bornand-Perilli
newest authorized signatories
Lorenzo Pepe,
Dr. Eric Pierre Bornand,
Maike-Kristin Bürger,
Carmela Lucia Gina Bornand-Perilli
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.11.2008
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Meilen
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.559-1
UID/VAT
CHE-114.580.685
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Förderung von Projekten zur Bekämpfung der Armut und zur Unterstützung von Wehrlosen (Kinder, Betagte). Dabei stehen Vorhaben im Vordergrund, die der Verbesserung der Ernährungssituation, der Gesundheit und der Ausbildung der notleidenden Bevölkerung dienen. Die Stiftung ist weltweit tätig. Die Stiftung kann Projekte selbst oder in Zusammenarbeit mit Drittinstitutionen unterstützen und durchführen. Sie kann Beiträge für entsprechende Vorhaben und Direkthilfen an Einzelpersonen, Behörden und Gruppierungen aller Art und gleich welcher Rechtsform gewähren.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PRÜFAG Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Zürich | 14.07.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Liguster Treuhand- und Verwaltungs-AG | Zürich | 05.03.2021 | 13.07.2022 | |
Heinz Wössner, Revisionen und Treuhand | Rümlang | 13.11.2008 | 04.03.2021 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Pierre und Edeltrud Bornand-Stiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pierre und Edeltrud Bornand-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005520439, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pierre und Edeltrud Bornand-Stiftung, in Meilen, CHE-114.580.685, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 05.03.2021, Publ. 1005116152).
Domizil neu:
Teienstrasse 31, 8706 Meilen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Liguster Treuhand- und Verwaltungs-AG (CHE-107.843.193), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
PRÜFAG Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-107.980.476), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005116152, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pierre und Edeltrud Bornand-Stiftung, in Meilen, CHE-114.580.685, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 15.01.2009, S.30, Publ. 4827142).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bornand, Pierre, von Sainte-Croix, in Zumikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Heinz Wössner, Revisionen und Treuhand (CH-020.1.055.391-3), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pepe, Lorenzo, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Meilen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in London (UK), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bornand, Dr. Eric, von Zürich, in Meilen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bürger, Maike-Kristin, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Leipzig (DE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Liguster Treuhand- und Verwaltungs-AG (CHE-107.843.193), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4827142, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pierre und Edeltrud Bornand-Stiftung, in Meilen, CH-020.7.001.559-1, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 13.11.2008, S. 26, Publ. 4730406).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Eidg. Departement des Innern, in Bern.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.