Reports for PG3 AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PG3 AG
- PG3 AG has its legal headquarters in Steinhausen and is active. It operates in the sector «Fund management».
- The management of the company PG3 AG, which was founded on the 26.02.2013, consists of 10 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 23.01.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-236.100.982.
- There are 8 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Art De Finance AG, CDHO AG, nextVision Group GmbH.
Management (10)
newest board members
Dr. Wolfgang Clemens Zürcher,
Alfred Gantner,
Urs Berthold Wietlisbach
Executive board
Philippe Thomas Weiss,
Samuel Scherling,
Stephan Friedrich Müller,
Curdin Conrad,
Roland Heinrich Roffler
newest authorized signatories
Philippe Thomas Weiss,
Nina Hodel,
Marcel Erni,
Samuel Scherling,
Stephan Friedrich Müller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.02.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Steinhausen
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.037.651-9
UID/VAT
CHE-236.100.982
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Beraten, Verwalten und das Anbieten von Kollektiven Kapitalanlagen und ist dem Finanzinstitutsgesetz (FINIG) unterstellt. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 17.02.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PG3 AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005941382, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
PG3 AG, in Steinhausen, CHE-236.100.982, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 17.02.2023, Publ. 1005681296).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gantner, Alfred, von Flums, in Meggen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Oberägeri];
Weiss, Philippe, von Hünenberg, in Hünenberg, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005681296, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
PG3 AG, in Steinhausen, CHE-236.100.982, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2023, Publ. 1005664488).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Melnychuk, Ivan, von Zug, in Zug, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005664488, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
PG3 AG, in Steinhausen, CHE-236.100.982, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2022, Publ. 1005551277).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hodel, Nina, von Meggen, in Luzern, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.