Address
c/o Verein indicamino
Nebengrabenstrasse 40b
9430 St. Margrethen SG
Reports for Personalvorsorgestiftung von indicamino
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Personalvorsorgestiftung von indicamino
- Personalvorsorgestiftung von indicamino has its legal headquarters in St. Margrethen SG and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Operation of an pension fund».
- The management of the organization Personalvorsorgestiftung von indicamino consists of 7 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 22.02.2018.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-109.747.749.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Christoph Giger,
Franziska Zollinger-Niederberger,
Andreas Flückiger,
Esther Chavez
newest authorized signatories
Christoph Giger,
Adrian Schenk-Notter,
Andreas Vetsch,
Andreas Flückiger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.01.1977
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Margrethen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.7.016.339-3
UID/VAT
CHE-109.747.749
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vorsorge für die Mitarbeiter und Mitarbeiterinnen (ehemalige Mitarbeiter und Mitarbeiterinnen miteingeschlossen) der Stifterin durch Gewährung von Unterstützungen oder Beiträgen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Buchhaltungs- und Treuhand AG Altstätten SG | Altstätten | 18.07.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Personalvorsorgestiftung SIM
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Personalvorsorgestiftung von indicamino
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4072061, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Personalvorsorgestiftung von indicamino, in St. Margrethen, CHE-109.747.749, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 18.07.2016, Publ. 2958871).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Siemens Ens, Korni, von Arni BE, in Berneck, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schenk-Notter, Adrian, von Eggiwil, in Erlen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Giger, Christoph, von Gontenschwil, in Lutzenberg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2958871, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Personalvorsorgestiftung von indicamino, in St. Margrethen, CHE-109.747.749, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 08.01.2015, Publ. 1917805).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dreher, Thomas, von Gossau ZH, in Altstätten, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Knie-von Allmen, Regula, von Lauterbrunnen, in St. Margrethen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vetsch, Andreas, von Grabs, in Davos, Kassier (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Buchhaltungs- und Treuhand AG Altstätten SG (CHE-107.285.519), in Altstätten, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1917805, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Personalvorsorgestiftung von indicamino, in St. Margrethen, CHE-109.747.749, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 115 vom 18.06.2013, Publ. 923273).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bähler, Heinz, von Uebeschi, in Widnau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zollinger-Niederberger, Franziska, von Dallenwil, in Emmenbrücke (Emmen), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.