Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma A. Stadelmann AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.02.1973
Deletion from the commercial register
11.11.2013
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Allschwil
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.7.916.365-6
UID/VAT
CHE-109.648.389
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Berufliche Vorsorge im Rahmen des BVG und seiner Ausführungsbestimmungen für die Arbeitnehmer der Stifterfirma, mit dieser wirtschaftlich oder finanziell eng verbundener Unternehmungen, sowie für deren Angehörige und Hinterlassene gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Tod und Invalidität. Die Stiftung kann über die gesetzlichen Mindestleistungen hinaus weitergehende Vorsorge betreiben.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RST Treuhand AG | Basel | 10.12.2007 | 10.11.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma A. Stadelmann AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma A. Stadelmann AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1171861, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma A. Stadelmann AG in Liquidation, in Allschwil, CH-280.7.916.365-6, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 07.03.2013, Publ. 7094758). Mit Verfügung der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 06.09.2013 ist die Stiftung aufgehoben. Sie wird im Handelsregister gelöscht.
Publication number: 7094758, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma A. Stadelmann AG, in Allschwil, CH-280.7.916.365-6, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 18.07.2011, Publ. 6259320).
Name neu:
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma A. Stadelmann AG in Liquidation.
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht beider Basel (BSABB).
Organisation neu:
[Streichung der Angaben zur Organisation auf Grund geänderter Eintragungsbestimmungen.]. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 10.01.2013 aufgehoben.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stadelmann, Alfred Georg, von Basel, in Pfeffingen, Präsident und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidator [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bachmann-Röthlin, Markus, von Basel, in Rodersdorf, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidator [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Spoerri, Max, von Basel, in Reinach BL, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidator [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Holenstein, Nicole, von Kirchberg SG, in Basel, Mitglied und Liquidatorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidatorin [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 6259320, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma A. Stadelmann AG, in Allschwil, CH-280.7.916.365-6, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 09.02.2009, S. 6, Publ. 4868402).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bachmann-Röthlin, Markus, von Basel, in Rodersdorf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Hofstetten SO];
Spoerri, Max, von Basel, in Reinach BL, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Basel];
Stadelmann, Alfred Georg, von Basel, in Pfeffingen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Oberwil BL].