Reports for Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma Tulux AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma Tulux AG
- Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma Tulux AG has its legal headquarters in Tuggen, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of an pension fund».
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 18.09.2015. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SZ is CHE-109.787.111.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Felix Huber,
Renate Horisberger,
René Lendi,
Ivo Huber-Schnyder
newest authorized signatories
Felix Huber,
Renate Horisberger,
René Lendi,
Ivo Huber-Schnyder
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.04.1959
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Tuggen
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.003.439-7
UID/VAT
CHE-109.787.111
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fürsorge für die Angestellten und Arbeiter der Stifterfirma sowie deren Hinterbliebene durch Gewährung von Unterstützungen in Fällen von Alter, Tod, Krankheit, Unfall, Invalidität, Militärdienst oder Arbeitslosigkeit.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner | Schwyz | 31.10.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma Tulux AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2380285, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma TULUX AG, in Tuggen, CHE-109.787.111, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 31.10.2007, S. 11, Publ. 4178534).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Heidelberger-Bruhin, Josef, von Hochfelden, in Tuggen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Huber-Pfister, Albin, von Tuggen, in Tuggen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner (CHE-102.292.601), in Schwyz, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner];
Huber, Felix, von Tuggen, in Tuggen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift];
Horisberger-Huber, Renate, von Auswil, in Tuggen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lendi, René, von Tamins, in Tuggen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4178534, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma TULUX AG, in Tuggen, CH-130.0.003.439-7, Personalvorsorge, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 25.10.1999, S. 7286).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Zentralschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht, in Luzern.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner, in Schwyz, Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma TULUX AG, in T u g g e n (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 24.10. 1994, S. 5829).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Louis Huber-Hüppin, Mitglied des Stiftungsrats.
Stiftungsratsmitglied neu:
Ivo Huber-Schnyder, von und in Tuggen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.