Reports for PED PharmaEngineeringDietl GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PED PharmaEngineeringDietl GmbH
- PED PharmaEngineeringDietl GmbH has its legal headquarters in Liestal and is active. It operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- PED PharmaEngineeringDietl GmbH was founded on 23.05.2003.
- The last commercial register change was made on 12.10.2010. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BL under the UID CHE-110.021.369.
- The address is identical with 34 other active companies. These include: ABUplus GmbH, Aqualon AG, Artevetro Architekten AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.05.2003
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Liestal
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.4.006.572-4
UID/VAT
CHE-110.021.369
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von allgemeinen Consulting- und Engineeringdienstleistungen, vor allem im Pharma- und Kosmetikbereich. Die Gesellschaft kann gleichartige und verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie Grundeigentum erwerben oder verkaufen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PED PharmaEngineeringDietl GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5849848, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
PED PharmaEngineeringDietl GmbH, in Liestal, CH-280.4.006.572-4, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 18.02.2009, S. 7, Publ. 4886852).
Domizil neu:
Grammetstrasse 14, 4410 Liestal.
Publication number: 4886852, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
PED PharmaEngineeringDietl GmbH, bisher in Bubendorf, CH-280.4.006.572-4, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 10.06.2003, S. 4).
Statutenänderung:
10.02.2009.
Sitz neu:
Liestal.
Domizil neu:
Froburgstrasse 53, 4410 Liestal. Nebenleistungspflichten gemäss Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 10.02.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dietl, Arnulf, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Waldems (DE), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen von je CHF 1'000.-- [bisher: in Bubendorf, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.--];
Nachbur, Roger, von Büren SO, in Liestal, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1026150, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
PED PharmaEngineeringDietl GmbH, in Bubendorf, Erbringung von allgemeinen Consulting- und Engineeringdienstleistungen, vor allem im Pharma- und Kosmetikbereich, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 102 vom 30.05.2003, S. 4).
Statutenänderung:
22.05.2003.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Holzen, Cristina, von Buochs, in Basel, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dietl, Arnulf, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bubendorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 20'000.-- [bisher: mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 19'000.--].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.