Reports for PARKINVEST SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PARKINVEST SA
- PARKINVEST SA has its legal headquarters in Genève and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- PARKINVEST SA was founded on 30.12.2014.
- The last commercial register change was made on 28.12.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-441.164.463.
- Companies with an identical address: Amarine SARL, AMP Genève Sàrl, C.D.P. Cabinet D'Affaires Privées SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.12.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.557.054-3
UID/VAT
CHE-441.164.463
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, vente, administration, gestion, exploitation, location, édification et mise en valeur de biens immobiliers, courtage et prestation de conseil dans le domaine immobilier. La société pourra effectuer soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, industrielles, mobilières et immobilières (à l'exception des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE), en Suisse et à l'étranger, se rattachant directement ou indirectement au but principal. Elle peut également créer des succursales et des filiales, en Suisse et à l'étranger. La société pourra également accorder des prêts à ses actionnaires et/ou se solidariser, cautionner ou se porter-fort des prêts consentis par des tiers à ses actionnaires. achat, vente, administration, gestion, exploitation, location, édification et mise en valeur de biens immobiliers, courtage et prestation de conseil dans le domaine immobilier. La société pourra effectuer soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, industrielles, mobilières et immobilières (à l'exception des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE), en Suisse et à l'étranger, se rattachant directement ou indirectement au but principal. Elle peut également créer des succursales et des filiales, en Suisse et à l'étranger. La société pourra également accorder des prêts à ses actionnaires et/ou se solidariser, cautionner ou se porter-fort des prêts consentis par des tiers à ses actionnaires.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PARKINVEST SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005370453, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
PARKINVEST SA , précédemment à Villars-sur-Glâne, CHE-441.164.463 (FOSC du 08.12.2020, p. 0/1005042003). Statuts originaires du 24.12.2014.
Nouveau siège:
Genève, Rue Albert-Gos 5, 1206 Genève. Statuts du 17.12.2021.
Publication number: HR02-1005369738, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
PARKINVEST SA, à Villars-sur-Glâne, CHE-441.164.463 (FOSC du 08.12.2020, p. 0/1005042003). Cette entité juridique est radiée du registre du commerce du canton de Fribourg par suite du transfert du siège à Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1005042003, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
PARKINVEST SA, à Villars-sur-Glâne, CHE-441.164.463 (FOSC du 22.11.2019, p. 0/1004766000).
Personne radiée:
Jorand Jean Marc Henri, administrateur, signature individuelle.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Jorand Yannick Adrien Thierry, de Billens-Hennens, à Thônex, administrateur, signature individuelle.