Address
c/o Administration communale
2364 St-Brais
Reports for Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA
- Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA in St-Brais is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Electrical power production and utilities». Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA is active.
- The management of the company Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA consists of 2 persons.
- On the 26.09.2019 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA is registered under the UID CHE-115.819.937.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.07.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saint-Brais
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.3.005.280-4
UID/VAT
CHE-115.819.937
CHE-398.431.000 VAT
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Développement, installation, management et gestion, en Suisse, de sites de production d'énergie renouvelable, en particulier de sites d'énergie éolienne, ainsi que production et vente en Suisse et à l'étranger d'énergie électrique provenant de sources renouvelables, spécialement de provenance éolienne (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audit Transjurane SA | Delémont | 09.07.2012 | 25.09.2019 | |
Berney Associés Audit SA | Genève | 13.07.2010 | 08.07.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004725047, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA, à Saint-Brais, CHE-115.819.937, société anonyme (No. FOSC 182 du 20.09.2018, Publ. 1004459802). Selon déclaration du 05.06.2019, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Audit Transjurane SA (CH-670.3.002.594-8), à Delémont, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1004459802, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA, à Saint-Brais, CHE-115.819.937, société anonyme (No. FOSC 87 du 06.05.2016, Publ. 2820107).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Froidevaux, Frédy, de Le Bémont JU, à Saint-Brais, membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 2820107, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Parc Eolien de Saint-Brais SA, à Saint-Brais, CHE-115.819.937, société anonyme (No. FOSC 196 du 10.10.2013, Publ. 1121539).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Abbet, Pascal, de Vollèges, à Vessy (Veyrier), président, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec Patrick Roger Marcel Boéro;
Zanini, Claudio, de Chiasso, à Melide, vice-président et administrateur-délégué, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec Roland Eichenberger;
Boéro, Patrick Roger Marcel, ressortissant français, à Thoiry (FR), membre, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec Pascal Abbet;
Eichenberger, Roland, de Beinwil am See, à Morbio Inferiore, membre, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec Claudio Zanini.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gautier, Pierre André, de Genève, à Genève, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Friedli, David, de Seeberg, à Carouge GE, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.