Branches (1)
Reports for Paradies Touristik AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Paradies Touristik AG
- Paradies Touristik AG from Ftan operates in the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses» and is active.
- The company was founded on 16.06.1969.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 02.04.2020.
- The reported UID is CHE-101.360.789.
Management (6)
newest board members
Meike-Cathérine Bambach,
Wera Rahe,
Tanja Schmittner,
Maria Bassi,
Horst Rahe
newest authorized signatories
Meike-Cathérine Bambach,
Wera Rahe,
Tanja Schmittner,
Maria Bassi,
Horst Rahe
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.06.1969
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Scuol
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.004.086-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.360.789
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb und Betrieb von Hotels und Gaststätten aller Art, insbesondere des Hotels Haus Paradies in Ftan sowie von Ferien- und Wellnessanlagen, ausserdem Entwicklung und Betrieb von See- und Binnenschiffen, insbesondere von Passagierschiffen, deren Ein- und Vercharterung sowie diesbezügliche Maklertätigkeiten jeglicher Art. Des weiteren Tätigkeit als Reiseveranstalter und Freizeitgestalter und -vermittler sowie Entwicklung touristischer Produkte jeglicher Art und Vermarktung dieser und sonstiger Produkte und im übrigen Erbringung von Finanzdienstleistungen jeglicher Art sowie Entwicklung, Verwaltung und Vermarktung von Grundvermögen. Die Gesellschaft kann hiezu Immobilien erwerben, besitzen und veräussern und im weiteren Mobilien, Konzessionen, Patente, Lizenzen und Rechte aller Art erwerben und veräussern sowie Gesellschaften gründen und sich an irgendwelchen Gesellschaften direkt oder indirekt beteiligen und Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten sowie Kooperationen und Zusammenschlüsse mit anderen Gesellschaften eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ACT Audit & Tax AG | Zug | 02.04.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CBV Treuhand GmbH | Hünenberg | 11.08.2015 | 01.04.2020 | |
Allemann, Zinsli & Partner AG in Liquidation | Chur | <2004 | 10.08.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hotel Haus Paradies AG
- Paradies Touristic AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Paradies Touristik AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004864808, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Paradies Touristik AG, in Scuol, CHE-101.360.789, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 12.02.2016, S.0, Publ. 2663815).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
CBV Treuhand GmbH (CHE-114.486.508), in Hünenberg, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bambach, Meike-Catherine, genannt Meike, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Scuol, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bassi, Maria, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Altendorf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Meile, Thomas J., von St. Moritz, in St. Moritz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Winterthur, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Rahe, Wera, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Scuol, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Schmittner, Tanja, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Hamburg (DE), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
ACT Audit & Tax AG (CHE-114.287.848), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2663815, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Paradies Touristik AG, in Scuol, CHE-101.360.789, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 153 vom 11.08.2015, Publ. 2316045).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rahe, Horst, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Ftan (Scuol), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Hamburg (D)];
Rahe, Wera, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Ftan (Scuol), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2316045, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Paradies Touristik AG, in Scuol, CHE-101.360.789, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 17.04.2015, Publ. 2103559).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Allemann Zinsli & Partner AG (CH-350.3.006.098-8), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
CBV Treuhand GmbH (CHE-114.486.508), in Hünenberg, Revisionsstelle.
Zweigniederlassung neu:
Scuol (CHE-134.490.654) [bisher: Ftan (CH-350.9.000.759-8)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.