Reports for Pacast Handels-AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pacast Handels-AG
- Pacast Handels-AG has its legal headquarters in Sargans and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Trading with various goods».
- The management of the company Pacast Handels-AG, which was founded on the 12.12.1996, consists of 2 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 18.11.2021.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Pacast Handels-AG is the following: CHE-103.539.046.
- There are 8 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Baukautionsgenossenschaft Sargans-Werdenberg, Bruwisa Holding AG, EAB Holding AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.12.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sargans
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.041.727-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.539.046
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit allen chemischen Produkten, Herstellung allgemeiner chemischer Produkte, Herstellung von Additiven (chemische Verbindungen) für die alkalische Polimerisation sowie Beratung für die Kunststoffindustrie. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Immobilien bauen, kaufen oder verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Prefera Audit AG | Sargans | 12.08.2005 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Prefera Treuhand AG | Sargans | <2004 | 11.08.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pacast Handels-AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005337009, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Pacast Handels-AG, in Sargans, CHE-103.539.046, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 15.07.2015, S.0, Publ. 2270529).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruhin, Edgar, von Wangen (SZ), in Heiligkreuz (Mels), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Balgach];
Prefera Audit AG (CHE-110.139.812), in Sargans, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Prefera Audit AG]. [Ergänzung der UID der Revisionsstelle aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften].
Publication number: 2270529, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Pacast Handels-AG, in Sargans, CHE-103.539.046, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 05.09.2012, Publ. 6836118).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meynen Bruhin, Vanessa, von Neuheim, in Bioggio, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruhin, Edgar, von Wangen SZ, in Balgach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 6836118, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Pacast Handels-AG, in Sargans, CH-320.3.041.727-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 14.12.2007, S. 14, Publ. 4247062).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruhin, Roger, von Wangen SZ, in Bioggio, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Sargans];
Bruhin, Edgar, von Wangen SZ, in Balgach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Sargans];
Meynen Bruhin, Vanessa, von Neuheim, in Bioggio, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Sargans].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.