Reports for Pacast AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pacast AG
- Pacast AG has its legal headquarters in Sargans and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Production of chemical products».
- The management of the company Pacast AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 30.07.1987.
- The last commercial register change was made on 18.11.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-106.151.075.
- Next to the company Pacast AG there are 8 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Baukautionsgenossenschaft Sargans-Werdenberg, Bruwisa Holding AG, EAB Holding AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.07.1987
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sargans
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.027.526-6
UID/VAT
CHE-106.151.075
Sector
Production of chemical products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklungen von Verfahren und Komponenten, Beratung und Ausbildung für die Kunststoff-Industrie sowie Handel mit relevanten Produkten; Entwicklung neuartiger Patente und Verwertung sowie Übernahme und Verwertung von Lizenzen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an gleichen oder ähnlichen Unternehmen beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten sowie Immobilien überbauen, kaufen oder verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Prefera Audit AG | Sargans | 12.08.2005 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Prefera Treuhand AG | Sargans | <2004 | 11.08.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pacast AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005337008, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Pacast AG, in Sargans, CHE-106.151.075, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 16.07.2015, S.0, Publ. 2273265).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruhin, Edgar, von Wangen (SZ), in Heiligkreuz (Mels), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Balgach].
Publication number: 2273265, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Pacast AG, in Sargans, CHE-106.151.075, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 06.08.2013, Publ. 1015267).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruhin, Edgar, von Wangen SZ, in Balgach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Prefera Audit AG (CHE-110.139.812), in Sargans, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Prefera Audit AG].
Publication number: 1015267, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Pacast AG, in Sargans, CH-320.3.027.526-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 91 vom 14.05.2013, Publ. 7186618).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Boller, Dr. Andreas, von Hittnau, in Maienfeld, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.