Address
Chemin des Croisettes 14
1066 Epalinges
Reports for P & R trading-investment Co SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout P & R trading-investment Co SA
- P & R trading-investment Co SA from Epalinges operates in the sector «Trading with various goods» and is active.
- The management of the company P & R trading-investment Co SA consists of 2 persons.
- On the 06.12.2018 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-107.496.996.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.07.1993
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Epalinges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.088.292-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.496.996
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce, avec le Moyen-Orient et l'Afrique, de matières premières et produits divers; investissements.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Favre Révision SA | Lausanne | 05.11.2009 | 25.10.2017 | |
Fiduciaire Michel Favre SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 04.11.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- P & R trading-investment Co S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: P & R trading-investment Co SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004514431, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
P & R trading-investment Co S.A., à Epalinges, CHE-107.496.996 (FOSC du 25.05.2018, p. 0/4249921).
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Lanthemann Xavier, de Tentlingen, à Echallens. Schedel Patrizio, qui est maintenant à Monaco (Monaco), est nommé président.
Publication number: 4249921, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
P & R trading-investment Co S.A., à Epalinges, CHE-107.496.996 (FOSC du 26.10.2017, p. 0/3833839). Schedel Harald Horst n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: 3833839, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
P & R trading-investment Co S.A., à Epalinges, CHE-107.496.996 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Statuts modifiés le 13 octobre 2017.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par courrier électronique ou par lettre recommandée. Schedel Harald Horst et Schedel Patrizio sont maintenant à Pully. Fiduciaire Favre Révision SA (CH-550-1052902-1) n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 13 octobre 2017, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.