Address
Suhrenmattstrasse 7
5035 Unterentfelden
Reports for OWI Tortechnik AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout OWI Tortechnik AG
- OWI Tortechnik AG from Unterentfelden operates in the sector «Other construction» and is active.
- The management of the company OWI Tortechnik AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 12.05.2010.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 07.02.2023.
- The company OWI Tortechnik AG is registered under the UID CHE-115.680.384.
Management (3)
newest board members
Patrick Michael Stebler,
Katharina Stebler,
Hans Jörg Stebler
newest authorized signatories
Patrick Michael Stebler,
Katharina Stebler,
Hans Jörg Stebler
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.05.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Unterentfelden
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.032.845-2
UID/VAT
CHE-115.680.384
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Baubedarfsartikeln, Unterhalt und Reparatur von Türen und Toren aller Art sowie von Briefkästen und Serviceleistungen im Baubereich; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RVW Revisions AG | Aarau | 02.03.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
REIST PARTNER AG | Aarau | 19.05.2010 | 01.03.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: OWI Tortechnik AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005672090, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
OWI Tortechnik AG, in Unterentfelden, CHE-115.680.384, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2022, Publ. 1005462851).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Frey, Andrea, von Nunningen, in Unterentfelden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005462851, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
OWI Tortechnik AG, in Unterentfelden, CHE-115.680.384, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 26.08.2021, Publ. 1005278322).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stebler, Patrick, von Nunningen, in Muhen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Stebler, Katharina, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Muhen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Stebler, Hans Jörg, von Nunningen, in Unterentfelden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005278322, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
OWI Tortechnik AG, in Unterentfelden, CHE-115.680.384, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 11.02.2021, Publ. 1005098347).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stebler, Katharina, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Muhen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Klappacher, Katharina].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.