Reports for ORCA ProBase AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ORCA ProBase AG
- ORCA ProBase AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Muttenz. ORCA ProBase AG belongs to the industry «IT services» and is currently active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 10.09.2004.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 24.02.2010, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BL under the UID CHE-112.002.667.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.09.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Muttenz
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.007.904-9
UID/VAT
CHE-112.002.667
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Leistungen auf dem Gebiet der ICT und artverwandter Gebiete sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmen und Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Furrer Treuhand AG | Muttenz | 16.09.2004 | 23.02.2010 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ORCA ProBase AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5510666, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
ORCA ProBase AG, in Muttenz, CH-280.3.007.904-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2005, S. 4, Publ. 3032402).
Statutenänderung:
16.02.2010.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch eingeschriebene Briefe oder durch E-Mail mit Empfangsbestätigung, sofern Adressen bekannt, sonst durch Publikation im SHAB. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 16.02.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Furrer Treuhand AG, in Muttenz, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 3032402, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
ProBase AG, bisher in Reinach BL, CH-280.3.007.904-9, Erbringung von Leistungen auf dem Gebiet der EDV, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 87 vom 06.05.2005, S. 4, Publ. 2824410).
Statutenänderung:
19.09.2005.
Firma neu:
ORCA ProBase AG.
Sitz neu:
Muttenz.
Domizil neu:
Unter-Brieschhalden 5, 4132 Muttenz.
Zweck neu:
Erbringung von Leistungen auf dem Gebiet der ICT und artverwandter Gebiete sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmen und Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Weiteres Geschäftslokal:
Aeschengraben 10, 4010 Basel.
Publication number: 2824410, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
ProBase AG, in Reinach BL, CH-280.3.007.904-9, Erbringung von Leistungen auf dem Gebiet der EDV, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 180 vom 16.09.2004, S. 4, Publ. 2451684).
Statutenänderung:
27.04.2005.
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.--.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wenger, Christopher, von Tramelan, in Arlesheim, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gerber, Rolf, von Muttenz und Schangnau, in Muttenz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.