Reports for Omnisens S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Omnisens S.A.
- Omnisens S.A. with its legal headquarters in Morges is active. Omnisens S.A. operates in the sector «Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments».
- The management of the company Omnisens S.A. consists of 3 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 25.10.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-105.367.974.
- Deux Soeurs Sàrl, Scub H2o Sàrl, Swiss Mechanical Solutions (SMS) SA have the same address as Omnisens S.A..
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.01.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.105.780-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.367.974
Sector
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Développement, production et vente de systèmes de mesure, principalement optique et issus des travaux de recherche du Laboratoire de Métrologie de l'Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG SA | Lausanne | 26.02.2014 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Favre Révision SA | Lausanne | 16.07.2010 | 25.02.2014 | |
Fiduciaire Michel Favre SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 15.07.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Omnisens SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Omnisens S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005869005, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Omnisens S.A., à Morges, CHE-105.367.974 (FOSC du 30.11.2021, p. 0/1005345899). Currat Matthieu et Thévoz Olivier ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Candela Roberto et Brunetti Alessandro signent désormais individuellement. Nicoli Fabio, de Faido, à Massagno, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005345899, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Omnisens S.A., à Morges, CHE-105.367.974 (FOSC du 17.09.2018, p. 0/1004456944). Degrauwe Marc, Bals André, et Waldvogel Christian ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Currat Matthieu et Thévoz Olivier, lesquels ne sont plus directeurs, sont nommés administrateurs. Candela Roberto, de Italie, à Milan (Italie), président avec signature collective à deux, et Brunetti Alessandro, de Italie, à Milan (Italie), avec signature collective à deux, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Publication number: HR02-1004456944, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Omnisens S.A., à Morges, CHE-105.367.974 (FOSC du 27.07.2018, p. 0/4386741). La signature de Lacoin Geoffroy et Taburet Olivier est radiée. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Currat Matthieu, de La Verrerie, et Thévoz Olivier, de Missy, tous deux à Lausanne, directeurs.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.